EP2844499 - AXLE ATTACHMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAF-HOLLAND GmbH Hauptstrasse 26 63856 Bessenbach / DE | [2015/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOCK, Helmut Ringstrasse 16 63856 Bessenbach / DE | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13712534.0 | 25.03.2013 | [2017/09] | WO2013EP56194 | Priority number, date | DE201210207157 | 30.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012207157 | [2015/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013164139 | Date: | 07.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2844499 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2844499 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/09] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2844499 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60B35/00, B60B35/02, B60B35/04, B60G9/00, F16F1/368 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
B60B35/007 (EP,US);
B60B35/02 (EP,US);
B60G9/003 (EP,US);
B60B2310/302 (EP,US);
B60B2310/305 (EP,US);
B60B2310/306 (EP,US);
B60B2360/1442 (EP,US);
B60B2360/1448 (EP,US);
B60B2900/321 (EP,US);
B60B35/04 (EP,US);
B60G2200/31 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4306 (EP,US);
B60G2204/44 (EP,US);
B60G2206/81 (EP,US);
B60G2206/8201 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Title | German: | ACHSANBINDUNG | [2015/11] | English: | AXLE ATTACHMENT | [2015/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LIAISON D'ESSIEU | [2015/11] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 20.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.2017
05.12.2017
ADMISSIBLE BPW Bergische Achsen KG Ohlerhammer 51674 Wiehl / DE Opponent's representative DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/43] |
Former [2022/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.2017
05.12.2017
ADMISSIBLE BPW Bergische Achsen KG Ohlerhammer 51674 Wiehl / DE Opponent's representative Janke Scholl Patentanwälte PartG mbB Homberger Straße 5 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2018/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.2017
05.12.2017
ADMISSIBLE BPW Bergische Achsen KG Ohlerhammer 51674 Wiehl / DE Opponent's representative Bungartz Christophersen Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Homberger Strasse 5 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2018/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.2017
05.12.2017
ADMISSIBLE BPW Bergische Achsen KG Ohlerhammer 51674 Wiehl / DE Opponent's representative Christophersen, Ulrich Rudolf Bungartz Christophersen Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Homberger Strasse 5 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | 15.12.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.04.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 27.06.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.07.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.12.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 14.11.2019 | Appeal received No. T3020/19 | 13.02.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.02.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 25.05.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 23.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2013 | AL | 01.03.2017 | CY | 01.03.2017 | CZ | 01.03.2017 | DK | 01.03.2017 | EE | 01.03.2017 | FI | 01.03.2017 | HR | 01.03.2017 | IT | 01.03.2017 | LT | 01.03.2017 | LV | 01.03.2017 | MC | 01.03.2017 | MK | 01.03.2017 | MT | 01.03.2017 | NL | 01.03.2017 | RO | 01.03.2017 | RS | 01.03.2017 | SI | 01.03.2017 | SK | 01.03.2017 | SM | 01.03.2017 | IE | 25.03.2017 | LU | 25.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | BG | 01.06.2017 | NO | 01.06.2017 | GR | 02.06.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | PT | 03.07.2017 | AT | 25.03.2018 | PL | 25.03.2021 | SE | 26.03.2021 | GB | 25.03.2023 | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/11] | HU | 25.03.2013 | |
AL | 01.03.2017 | ||
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
AT | 25.03.2018 | ||
PL | 25.03.2021 | ||
SE | 26.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | HU | 25.03.2013 | |
AL | 01.03.2017 | ||
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
AT | 25.03.2018 | ||
SE | 26.03.2021 | ||
Former [2020/34] | HU | 25.03.2013 | |
AL | 01.03.2017 | ||
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
AT | 25.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 25.03.2013 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
AT | 25.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 25.03.2013 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
AT | 25.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.03.2013 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
AT | 25.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.03.2013 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 01.03.2017 | |
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE29615286U (TRENKAMP & GEHLE [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,13,14 * page 5, line 13 - line 26; figures 1-5; claims 1,7 * [A] 8-10; | [X]WO2010059037 (WEWELER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4,12-14 * sentence 17 - sentence 37; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2010095924 (WEWELER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [X]US2011227308 (AALDERINK DERK GEERT [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,8-14 * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0115]; figure 3 * | Opposition | US1517855 | US3251608 | US3844579 | DE29615286U | WO2009014423 | WO2010059037 | WO2010095924 | US2011227308 | GB184139 | US3434707 | WO2014142656 |