EP2825866 - ANALYTICAL METHOD FOR COMMON AND SPECIFIC CHARACTERIZATION OF SKIN CARCINOGENESIS BY FTIR MICROSPECTROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mc Professional Oü Voistluse 23-35 10132 Tallinn / EE | For all designated states Eikje, Natalja Haslevein 26-702 0571 Oslo / NO | For all designated states Skrebova, Irina Voistluse 23-35 10132 Tallinn / EE | [2015/07] |
Former [2015/04] | For all designated states Mc Professional Oü Võistluse 23-35 Tallinn 10132 / EE | ||
For all designated states Eikje, Natalja Urnesveien 11 Tysvaervaag 5565 / NO | |||
For all designated states Skrebova, Irina Voistluse 23/25-35 HM Tallinn 10132 / EE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIKJE, Natalja Haslevein 26-702 0571 Oslo / NO | [2015/04] | Application number, filing date | 13713349.2 | 21.02.2013 | WO2013EE00001 | Priority number, date | US201261595050P | 21.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261595050 P | [2015/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013123950 | Date: | 29.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2825866 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/35, A61B5/00 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
A61B5/0075 (EP);
G01N21/3563 (US);
A61B5/444 (EP);
A61B5/7257 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (US);
G01N21/95607 (US);
G01N33/574 (US);
G06F17/18 (US);
G01N2021/3595 (EP,US);
G01N21/35 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Title | German: | ANALYTISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR ALLGEMEINEN UND SPEZIFISCHEN CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON HAUTKARZINOGENESE DURCH FTIR-MIKROSPEKTROSKOPIE | [2015/04] | English: | ANALYTICAL METHOD FOR COMMON AND SPECIFIC CHARACTERIZATION OF SKIN CARCINOGENESIS BY FTIR MICROSPECTROSCOPY | [2015/04] | French: | MÉTHODE ANALYTIQUE DE CARACTÉRISATION COMMUNE ET SPÉCIFIQUE D'UNE CARCINOGENÈSE DE LA PEAU PAR MICROSPECTROSCOPIE FTIR | [2015/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 29.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/28] | 11.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/28] | 22.02.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.06.2015 | 28.02.2018 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2018 | 28.02.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5539207 (WONG PATRICK T T [CA]) [A] 1 * columns 1-8; figures 1-4,10,12,21 *; | [A]WO2010067353 (VIRAMEDICS LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1* pages 19,42-49; figure 15 *; | [YD] - EIKJE NATALJA SKREBOVA ED - KOLLIAS NIKIFOROS ET AL, "DNA-RNA, DNA-DNA, DNA-protein and protein-protein interactions in diagnosis of skin cancers by FT-IR microspectroscopy", PHOTONIC THERAPEUTICS AND DIAGNOSTICS VII, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, (20110210), vol. 7883, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.874692, pages 1 - 5, XP060006072 [YD] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0005]; tables 1a-c,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.874692 | [YD] - EIKJE N S, "Numerical modeling and analytical treatment of IR spectra in the diagnosis of skin cancers", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING USA, (2010), vol. 7999, ISSN 0277-786X, XP002698177 [YD] 1-8 * pages 1-2 * * pages 5-6 * | [YD] - EIKJE NATALJA SKREBOVA ET AL, "Vibrational spectroscopy for molecular characterisation and diagnosis of benign, premalignant and malignant skin tumours", BIOTECHNOLOGY ANNUAL REVIEW, VOL 11 ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV, SARA BURGERHARTSTRAAT 25, PO BOX 211, 1000 AE AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS SERIES : BIOTECHNOLOGY ANNUAL REVIEW, (2005), ISBN 0-444-51952-1(H), pages 191 - 225, XP009170055 [YD] 1-8 * abstract * * pages 191-195 * * pages 197,199 * * page 202; table 1 * * pages 205-209; figure 2 * | Examination | - Natalja Skrebova ET AL, "Data processing and analysis of benign, premalignant, and malignant changes in skin tissue samples using FT-IR microspectroscopy", SPIE - International Society for Optical Engineering. Proceedings, US, (20030731), vol. 5047, doi:10.1117/12.484316, ISSN 0277-786X, ISBN 978-1-5106-0753-8, page 378, XP055388211 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.484316 | by applicant | - FEDERMAN, D.G.; CONCATO, J.; KIRSNER, R.S., "Screening for skin cancer: absence of evidence", ARCH. DERMATOL., (2009), vol. 145, page 926 | - DIGIOVANNI, J., "Multistage carcinogenesis in mouse skin", PHARMACOL. THER., (1992), vol. 54, no. 1, pages 63 - 128 | - CHIMENTO, S.M.; KIRSNER, R.S., "Understanding the role of c-Jun and Jun B transcription factors in skin cancer development", J. INVEST. DENNATOL., (2011), vol. 131, page 1002 | - EIKJE, N.S.; AIZAWA, K.; OZAKI, Y., "Vibrational spectroscopy for molecular characterization and diagnosis of benign, premalignant and malignant skin tumours", BIOTECHNOLOGY ANNUAL REVIEW, (2005), vol. 11, pages 191 - 226 | - "Numerical modeling and analytical treatment ofIR spectra in the diagnosis of skin cancers", EIKJE, N.S., SFM 2010: Optical Technologies in Biophysics and Medicine XII, (2011), vol. 7999, page 799909 |