EP2815045 - KEY AND DISC TUMBLER CYLINDER LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abloy Oy Wahlforssinkatu 20 80100 Joensuu / FI | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ULJENS, Peder Juoksijankatu 6 B 5 FI-20360 Turku / FI | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2017/28] |
Former [2014/52] | Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 Antinkatu 3 C 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 13713932.5 | 14.02.2013 | [2017/28] | WO2013FI50174 | Priority number, date | FI20120000050 | 16.02.2012 Original published format: FI 20120050 | FI20120000051 | 16.02.2012 Original published format: FI 20120051 | FI20120000053 | 16.02.2012 Original published format: FI 20120053 | [2014/52] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013121114 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2815045 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2815045 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E05B29/00 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
E05B29/0013 (EP,US);
E05B19/0017 (US);
E05B27/00 (US);
E05B19/0047 (EP,US);
E05B29/0066 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7559 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7791 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | 01.08.2014 | Title | German: | SCHLÜSSEL UND PLÄTTCHENZYLINDERSCHLOSS | [2014/52] | English: | KEY AND DISC TUMBLER CYLINDER LOCK | [2014/52] | French: | CLÉ ET SERRURE À CYLINDRE À PAILLETTES | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 18.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15159565.9 / EP2902569 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.07.2017 | CY | 12.07.2017 | FI | 12.07.2017 | MC | 12.07.2017 | SM | 12.07.2017 | IS | 12.11.2017 | LU | 14.02.2018 | MT | 14.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | CY | 12.07.2017 | |
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/27] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 12.07.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB157882 (JOSEPH ABBE) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 65-72; figure 11 *; | [A]DE395252 (HANS SPRUTH DIPL ING) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1503586 (WAERTSILAE OY AB [FI]) [A] 12 * figure . *; | [A]WO9208862 (HAAVIKKO PAAVO [FI]) [A] 12-15,19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0488619 (ABLOY SECURITY LTD OY [FI]) [A] 12-15,19* column 5, lines 11-21; figure - *; | [AD]US6758074 (PRUNBAUER KURT [AT]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008034345 (LI SHANDE [CN]) [A] 12,19 * figure - * | by applicant | SE329104 | US6758074 |