EP2947995 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING STRAINED FERMENTED DAIRY PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2023 | Change: Despatch of interlocutory decision | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Gervais Danone 17, Boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | For all designated states Danone, S.A. Buenos Aires 21 E-08029 Barcelona / ES | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARIN, Françoise Calle Iris 76 E-28109 Madrid / ES | 02 /
FLABBI, Paola Calle Sanchez Diaz 6 piso 4d E-28027 Madrid / ES | 03 /
CORRET, François 52 avenue des Minimes F-94300 Vincennes / FR | 04 /
BILBAO, Almudena Calle Juan Sanchez 17, 1°C E-28035 Madrid / ES | 05 /
PAQUET, Denis 65 avenue Victor Hugo F-92140 Clamart / FR | 06 /
CREPEL, Pascal 50 allée de la Clairière F-91190 Gif Sur Yvette / FR | 07 /
MARCHAL, Laurent 8 allée du bocage F-91360 Villemoisson-sur-Orge / FR | [2017/22] |
Former [2015/49] | 01 /
WARIN, Françoise Calle Iris 76 E-28109 Madrid / ES | ||
02 /
FLABBI, Paola Calle Sanchez Diaz 6 piso 4d E-28027 Madrid / ES | |||
03 /
CORRET, François 52 avenue des Minimes F-94300 Vincennes / FR | |||
04 /
BILBAO, Almudena Calle Juan Sanchez 17 1°C E-28035 Madrid / ES | |||
05 /
PAQUET, Denis 65 avenue Victor Hugo F-92140 Clamart / FR | |||
06 /
CREPEL, Pascal 50 allée de la Clairière F-91190 Gif Sur Yvette / FR | |||
07 /
MARCHAL, Laurent 8 allée du bocage F-91360 Villemoisson-sur-Orge / FR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/22] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66 rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2015/49] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13713956.4 | 25.01.2013 | [2015/49] | WO2013IB00162 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014114970 | Date: | 31.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2947995 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2947995 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/123, A23C9/133 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
A23C9/123 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A23C9/1238 (KR,US);
A23C9/1234 (KR,US);
A23C9/13 (RU);
A23C9/133 (EP,KR,US);
A23C2210/15 (EP,KR,US);
A23C2260/05 (EP,KR,US);
A23V2300/21 (KR);
A23V2300/24 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ENTWÄSSERTEN FERMENTIERTEN MILCHPRODUKTES | [2016/50] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING STRAINED FERMENTED DAIRY PRODUCT | [2015/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT LAITIER FERMENTÉ ET ÉGOUTTÉ | [2016/50] |
Former [2015/49] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEFILTERTEN FERMENTIERTEN MILCHPRODUKTS | ||
Former [2015/49] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN PRODUIT LAITIER FERMENTÉ FILTRÉ | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 21.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2018
19.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina IP Department, et al, et al Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2018
19.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V., et al, et al IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | ||
Former [2021/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2018
19.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V., et al, et al Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | ||
Former [2018/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V., et al, et al IP Department P.O. Box 238 Bronland 20 6700 AE Wageningen / NL | 13.03.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.07.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.06.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 25.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 23.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 27.06.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | Appeal following opposition | 06.08.2019 | Appeal received No. T2268/19 | 24.10.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.06.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 30.06.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2013 | AL | 31.05.2017 | AT | 31.05.2017 | CY | 31.05.2017 | CZ | 31.05.2017 | DK | 31.05.2017 | EE | 31.05.2017 | FI | 31.05.2017 | GR | 31.05.2017 | HR | 31.05.2017 | LT | 31.05.2017 | LV | 31.05.2017 | MC | 31.05.2017 | MK | 31.05.2017 | PT | 31.05.2017 | RO | 31.05.2017 | RS | 31.05.2017 | SE | 31.05.2017 | SI | 31.05.2017 | SK | 31.05.2017 | SM | 31.05.2017 | TR | 31.05.2017 | BG | 31.08.2017 | NO | 31.08.2017 | IS | 30.09.2017 | IE | 25.01.2018 | LU | 25.01.2018 | MT | 25.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 25.01.2013 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
GR | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 25.01.2018 | ||
LU | 25.01.2018 | ||
MT | 25.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 25.01.2013 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
GR | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 25.01.2018 | ||
LU | 25.01.2018 | ||
MT | 25.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 25.01.2018 | ||
LU | 25.01.2018 | ||
MT | 25.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 25.01.2018 | ||
LU | 25.01.2018 | ||
MT | 25.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 25.01.2018 | ||
LU | 25.01.2018 | ||
MT | 25.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 25.01.2018 | ||
LU | 25.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 25.01.2018 | ||
LU | 25.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 25.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 25.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2252228 (SITIA YOMO SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-9 * example - *; | [YD]WO9827825 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [YD] 1-9 * page 11; example 1; claim - *; | [Y]US2006216372 (CREPEL PASCAL [FR], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0063]; example -; claim - * * paragraph [0033] *; | [Y]EP1815746 (MEIJI DAIRIES CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] - [00 9] - [0013]; example - *; | [Y]WO2012139632 (DANONE SA [ES], et al) [Y] 1-9 * pages 1, 3, 4; example - * * page 6 - page 11 * * page 18 - page 19 *; | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "Joghurt-Stretching - neues Verfahren zur Konsistenzeinstellung.", DEUTSCHE MILCHWIRTSCHAFT, (1995), vol. 46, no. 8, page 421, XP009172951 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * | [Y] - B Özer, "6 Production of Concentrated Products", Fermented Milks, Blackwell Science Ltd, (20060101), pages 128 - 155, XP055045789 [Y] 1-9 * page 135 - page 137; figure 6.6 * * page 143 - page 145 * | [Y] - TAMIME A Y ET AL, "RHEOLOGIE UND MIKROSTRUKTUR VON LABNEH NACH HERSTELLUNG AUS KUHMILCH MIT HILFE VON DREI VERSCHIEDENEN VERFAHREN", MILCHWISSENSCHAFT, VV GMBH VOLKSWIRTSCHAFTLICHER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (19900101), vol. 45, no. 9, ISSN 0026-3788, page 612, XP000164653 [Y] 1-9 * column 1, paragraph l * | [Y] - HAGGAG H F ET AL, "PRODUCTION OF ZABADI, FROM ULTRAFILTERED BUFFALO'S MILK", FOOD CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER LTD, NL, (19880101), vol. 30, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0308-8146(88)90021-0, ISSN 0308-8146, pages 29 - 36, XP000572051 [Y] 1-9 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0308-8146(88)90021-0 | by applicant | WO9827825 | WO2007095969 | Opposition | CA2167020 | WO2007095969 | - "Yoghurt stretching", Deutsche Milkwirtschaft, (19950000), vol. 8, page 421, XP055467089 | - TAMIME et al., "The production of ''Labneh'' by ultrafitration: a new technology", Journal of the Society of Dairy Technology, (19890500), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 35 - 39, XP055192814 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1471-0307.1989.tb02150.x | - GNPD, Database accession no. 1213843, XP055467097 |