EP2866768 - HEADREST FOR MASSAGE TABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kállay, Ádám Szent György u. 22. II/7. 9400 Sopron / HU | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Kocsis, Péter JUREX Intellectual Property Office P.O. Box 78 1656 Budapest / HU | [2015/19] | Application number, filing date | 13714328.5 | 07.03.2013 | WO2013HU00026 | Priority number, date | HUP1200153 | 09.03.2012 Original published format: HU P1200153 | [2015/19] | Filing language | HU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013132280 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2866768 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61G13/00, A61G13/12 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
A61G13/009 (EP);
A61G13/121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Title | German: | KOPFSTÜTZE FÜR MASSAGELIEGE | [2015/19] | English: | HEADREST FOR MASSAGE TABLE | [2015/19] | French: | APPUI-TÊTE POUR TABLE DE MASSAGE | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/19] | 14.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 09.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/12] | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time [2018/12] | Request for further processing for: | 30.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 30.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.04.2015 | Decision despatched | 30.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 30.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.04.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.10.2014 | M02   Fee paid on   30.12.2014 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2015 | 31.03.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4660549 (KOWALSKI FRANK P [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 * * column 7, line 19 - column 9, line 4 *; | [AD]US5427436 (LLOYD JOHN T [US]) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 30; figures 1a-1c *; | [A]EP1396246 (A DEC INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1,3,4 * * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] *; | [A]US2010211099 (RADERMACHER MARK [US]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0052] - [0056]; figures 4,5,7,8,10a,11a * | by applicant | US5427436 | CN2772483Y | WO2006138298 | US2008271248 | WO2009042706 | US2011296620 |