EP2830477 - WATER BOTTLE CAP ASSEMBLIES FOR AN ENDOSCOPIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Endoscopy Group, Inc. 5976 Heisley Road Mentor, OH 44060 / US | [2016/45] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states Bracco Diagnostics Inc. 259 Prospect Plains Road, Building H Monroe Township, NJ 08831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLCOTT, Kenneth, E. 8 Bittersweet Court Centerport, NY 11721 / US | 02 /
CUSHNER, Jeffrey, B. 871 Carol Court Woodmere, NY 11598 / US | 03 /
MANDELUP, Ethan, J. 4-75 48th Avenue Apartment 206 Long Island City, NY 11109 / US | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | ip21 Ltd Central Formalities Department Lakeside 300 Old Chapel Way Broadland Business Park, Norwich Norfolk NR7 0WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13714413.5 | 15.03.2013 | WO2013US32005 | Priority number, date | US201261618054P | 30.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261618054 P | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013148311 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2830477 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
A61B1/00068 (EP,US);
A61B1/00128 (US);
A61B1/00119 (US);
A61B1/00137 (US);
A61B1/015 (EP,US);
A61B1/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Title | German: | WASSERFLASCHENKAPPENANORDNUNGEN FÜR EINE ENDOSKOPISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2015/06] | English: | WATER BOTTLE CAP ASSEMBLIES FOR AN ENDOSCOPIC DEVICE | [2015/06] | French: | ENSEMBLES DE BOUCHON DE BOUTEILLE D'EAU DESTINÉS À UN DISPOSITIF D'ENDOSCOPIE | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 04.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2022 | Observations by third parties | 14.09.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/13] | 14.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.11.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6485412 (BYRNE DONNY M [US]) [Y] 8* paragraph [0056] *; | [XY]US2010022834 (NODA KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,10,12-14 * figure 3 * [Y] 8; | [XY]US2011263939 (KAYE CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-11 * paragraphs [0026] , [0 28] , [0 34] , [0 35]; figure 2 * [Y] 8 | other | US5133336 | US5437654 | US2007043262 | US2009264705 | WO2012051432 | EP2476365 |