EP2831592 - BREAST CANCER ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Nottingham Trent University Clifton Lane Nottingham NG11 8NS / GB | [2018/39] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states The Nottingham Trent University Clifton Lane Nottingham NG11 8NS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINLEY, Adam School of Science and Technology The Nottingham Trent University Clifton Lane Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG11 8NS / GB | 02 /
MATHIEU, Morgan School of Science and Technology The Nottingham Trent University Clifton Lane Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG11 8NS / GB | 03 /
MCARDLE, Stephanie School of Science and Technology The Nottingham Trent University Clifton Lane Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG11 8NS / GB | 04 /
LU, Chungui School of Science and Technology The Nottingham Trent University Clifton Lane Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG11 8NS / GB | 05 /
REES, Robert School of Science and Technology The Nottingham Trent University Clifton Lane Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG11 8NS / GB | 06 /
TAT CHAN, Stephen Yan Department of Clinical Oncology, Nottingham University Hospitals Trust - City Hospital Campus Hucknall Road Nottingham NG51PB / GB | 07 /
AHMED ABDEL-FATEH, Tarek Mohamed 18 Chilwell Street Lenton, Nottingham NG71SB / GB | [2018/39] |
Former [2015/06] | 01 /
LINLEY, Adam School of Science and Technology The Nottingham Trent University Clifton Lane Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG11 8NS / GB | ||
02 /
MATHIEU, Morgan School of Science and Technology The Nottingham Trent University Clifton Lane Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG11 8NS / GB | |||
03 /
MCARDLE, Stephanie School of Science and Technology The Nottingham Trent University Clifton Lane Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG11 8NS / GB | |||
04 /
LU, Chungui School of Science and Technology The Nottingham Trent University Clifton Lane Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG11 8NS / GB | |||
05 /
REES, Robert School of Science and Technology The Nottingham Trent University Clifton Lane Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG11 8NS / GB | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/39] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2015/06] | Elsy, David Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13715406.8 | 27.03.2013 | [2018/39] | WO2013GB50794 | Priority number, date | GB20120005361 | 27.03.2012 Original published format: GB 201205361 | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013144616 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2831592 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2831592 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, A61P35/00, A61K39/395, A61K31/704 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
G01N33/57415 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
G01N2333/914 (US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/06] | G01N33/574, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRUSTKREBSTEST | [2015/06] | English: | BREAST CANCER ASSAY | [2015/06] | French: | TEST DE CANCER DU SEIN | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 13.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2015 | 31.03.2017 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2013 | AL | 26.09.2018 | AT | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | ES | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | IT | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | PL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | RS | 26.09.2018 | SE | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | SM | 26.09.2018 | TR | 26.09.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | NO | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | PT | 26.01.2019 | IE | 27.03.2019 | LU | 27.03.2019 | MT | 27.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 27.03.2013 | |
AL | 26.09.2018 | ||
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9953061 (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US]) [Y] 1-12* p. 36-62, example 1, table V *; | [Y]WO2005005601 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * tab. 4 and claims *; | [XYI]WO2005039634 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al) [X] 9,11 * p. 10 and claims * [Y] 8,12 [I] 10; | [Y]WO2011109637 (KOO FOUNDATION SUN YAT SEN CANCER CT [CN], et al) [Y] 4-8 * claims 1-47 *; | [Y]WO2011130495 (NUVERA BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [Y] 4-8 * example 9 *; | [XPI] - ABDEL-FATAH T M A ET AL, "HAGE (DDX43) Protein Expression is a Powerful Independent Biomarker of Poor Clinical Outcome of Breast Cancer (BC) and Could be a Potential Therapeutic Target for ER Negative BC", JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD, GB, (20120901), vol. 228, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 0022-3417, page S11, XP009170982 [XP] 1-7 * abstract * [I] 8-12 | [I] - LUCA GIANNI ET AL, "Efficacy and safety of neoadjuvant pertuzumab and trastuzumab in women with locally advanced, inflammatory, or early HER2-positive breast cancer (NeoSphere): a randomised multicentre, open-label, phase 2 trial", THE LANCET ONCOLOGY, (20120101), vol. 13, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S1470-2045(11)70336-9, ISSN 1470-2045, pages 25 - 32, XP055052201 [I] 12 * the whole document, see especially p. 25-27 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1470-2045(11)70336-9 | [XY] - MATHIEU MORGAN G ET AL, "HAGE, a cancer/testis antigen expressed at the protein level in a variety of cancers", CANCER IMMUNITY, ACADEMY OF CANCER IMMUNOLOGY, CH, (20100101), vol. 10, no. 2, ISSN 1424-9634, pages 1 - 8, XP009171017 [X] 11 * p. 1 and 5 * [Y] 8-10 | by applicant | - MATHIEU ET AL., CANCER IMMUNITY, (2010), vol. 10, pages 2 - 9 | - BREAST. DIS, (2000), vol. 11, pages 113 - 124 | - WOLFF AC ET AL., J.CLIN.ONCOL., (2007), vol. 25, pages 118 - 145 | - DENT R, CLIN. CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 13, pages 4429 - 34 | - GUARNERI V ET AL., ANN. ONCOL., (2009), vol. 20, pages 1193 - 1198 | - KYTE JA ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2011), vol. 17, pages 4568 - 4580 | - NENINGER E ET AL., J. IMMUNOTHER, (2009), vol. 32, pages 92 - 99 | - SAMPSON JH ET AL., NEURO. ONCOL., (2010), vol. 13, pages 324 - 333 | - ZHOU ET AL., J. EXP. CLIN. CANCER RES., (2011), vol. 20, page 2 | - WEIR GM, CANCERS, (2011), vol. 3, pages 3114 - 3142 | - NAT. REV. IMMUNOL., (2008), vol. 8, pages 59 - 73 | - GLUCK S; MAMOUNAS T, "Improving outcomes in early-stage breast cancer", ONCOLOGY (WILLISTON PARK, vol. 24, pages 1 - 15 | - CLARKE M; COATES AS; DARBY SC ET AL., "Adjuvant chemotherapy in oestrogen- receptor-poor breast cancer: patient-level meta-analysis of randomised trials", LANCET, (2008), vol. 371, doi:doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(08)60069-0, pages 29 - 40, XP022408838 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(08)60069-0 | - DOTAN E; GOLDSTEIN LJ, "Optimizing chemotherapy regimens for patients with early-stage breast cancer", CLIN BREAST CANCER, vol. 10, no. 1, pages E8 - 15 | - HARRIS L; FRITSCHE H; MENNEL R ET AL., "American Society of Clinical Oncology 2007 update of recommendations for the use of tumour markers in breast cancer", J CLIN ONCOL, (2007), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1200/JCO.2007.14.2364, pages 5287 - 312, XP055419000 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2007.14.2364 | - HARBECK N; SALEM M; NITZ U ET AL., "Personalized treatment of early-stage breast cancer: present concepts and future directions", CANCER TREAT REV, vol. 36, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ctrv.2010.04.007, pages 584 - 94, XP027487294 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ctrv.2010.04.007 | - MARTELANGE V; DE SMET C; DE PLAEN E ET AL., "Identification on a Human Sarcoma of Two New Genes with Tumor-specific Expression", CANCER RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 60, pages 3848 - 3855, XP002256958 | - ADAMS SP; SAHOTA SS; MIJOVIC A ET AL., "Frequent expression of HAGE in presentation chronic myeloid leukaemias", LEUKEMIA, (2002), vol. 16, no. 11, pages 2238 - 42 | - MATHIEU MG; KNIGHTS AJ; PAWELEC G ET AL., "HAGE, a cancer/testis antigen with potential for melanoma immunotherapy: identification of several MHC class I/II HAGE-derived immunogenic peptides", CANCER IMMUNOLLMMUNOTHER, (2007), vol. 56, doi:doi:10.1007/s00262-007-0331-2, pages 1885 - 1895, XP019561038 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00262-007-0331-2 | - PINDER SE; ELLIS 10; GALEA M ET AL., "Pathological prognostic factors in breast cancer. III. Vascular invasion: relationship with recurrence and survival in a large study with long-term follow-up", HISTOPATHOLOGY, (1994), vol. 24, pages 41 - 7 | - ELSTON CW, "Ellis 10: Pathological prognostic factors in breast cancer. I. The value of histological grade in breast cancer: experience from a large study with long-term follow-up", HISTOPATHOLOGY, (1991), vol. 19, pages 403 - 10 | - MCSHANE LM; ALTMAN DG; SAUERBREI W ET AL., "Reporting recommendations for tumour marker prognostic studies (REMARK", J NATL CANCER INST, (2005), vol. 97, pages 1180 - 4 | - ABDEL-FATAH TM; POWE DG; BALL G ET AL., "Proposal for a modified grading system based on mitotic index and Bcl2 provides objective determination of clinical outcome for patients with breast cancer", J PATHOL, (2010), vol. 222, pages 388 - 99 | - ABDEL-FATAH TM; POWE DG; AGBOOLA J ET AL., "The biological, clinical and prognostic implications of p53 transcriptional pathways in breast cancers", J PATHOL, (2010), vol. 220, pages 419 - 34 | - CALLAGY GM; PHAROAH PD; PINDER SE ET AL., "Bcl-2 is a prognostic marker in breast cancer independently of the Nottingham Prognostic Index", CLIN CANCER RES, (2006), vol. 12, pages 2468 - 75 | - TAN DS; MARCHIO C; JONES RL ET AL., "Triple negative breast cancer: molecular profiling and prognostic impact in adjuvant anthracycline-treated patients", BREAST CANCER RES TREAT, (2008), vol. 111, pages 27 - 44 | - SAUTER G; LEE J; BARTLETT JM ET AL., "Guidelines for human epidermal growth factor receptor 2 testing: biologic and methodologic considerations", J CLIN ONCOL, (2009), vol. 27, pages 1323 - 33 | - HOLM S, "A simple sequentially rejective multiple test procedure", SCAND J STAT, (1979), vol. 6, pages 65 - 70 | - LURQUIN C; LETHE B; DE PLAEN E ET AL., "Contrasting frequencies of antitumor and anti-vaccine T cells in metastases of a melanoma patient vaccinated with a MAGE tumour antigen", J EXP MED, (2005), vol. 201, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.20041378, pages 249 - 57, XP002415288 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20041378 | - ROMAN-GOMEZ J; JIMENEZ-VELASCO A; AGIRRE X ET AL., "Epigenetic regulation of human cancer/testis antigen gene, HAGE, in chronic myeloid leukaemia", HAEMATOLOGICA, (2007), vol. 92, pages 153 - 62 | - OTTE M; ZAFRAKAS M; RIETHDORF L ET AL., "MAGE-A gene expression pattern in primary breast cancer", CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 6682 - 7, XP002277597 | - KURASHIGE T; NOGUCHI Y; SAIKAT ET AL., "NY-ESO-1 expression and immunogenicity associated with transitional cell carcinoma: correlation with tumour grade", CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 4671 - 4 | - YAKIREVICH E; SABO E; LAVIE O ET AL., "Expression of the MAGE-A4 and NY-ESO-1 cancer-testis antigens in serous ovarian neoplasms", CLIN CANCER RES, (2003), vol. 9, pages 6453 - 60, XP003022712 | - KIM YI; GIULIANO A; HATCH KD ET AL., "Global DNA hypomethylation increases progressively in cervical dysplasia and carcinoma", CANCER, (1994), vol. 74, pages 893 - 9, XP008048083 | - QU G; DUBEAU L; NARAYAN A ET AL., "Satellite DNA hypomethylation vs. overall genomic hypomethylation in ovarian epithelial tumours of different malignant potential", MUTAT RES, (1999), vol. 423, doi:doi:10.1016/S0027-5107(98)00229-2, pages 91 - 101, XP002265794 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0027-5107(98)00229-2 | - SOARES J; PINTO AE; CUNHA CV ET AL., "Global DNA hypomethylation in breast carcinoma: correlation with prognostic factors and tumour progression", CANCER, (1999), vol. 85, pages 112 - 8 | - PIYATHILAKE CJ; FROST AR; BELL WC ET AL., "Altered global methylation of DNA: an epigenetic difference in susceptibility for lung cancer is associated with its progression", HUM PATHOL, (2001), vol. 32, pages 856 - 62 | - ZHOU L; BAO YL; ZHANG Y; WU Y; YU CL ET AL., "Knockdown of TSP50 inhibits cell proliferation and induces apoptosis in P19 cells", IUBMB LIFE, (2010), vol. 62, pages 825 - 832 | - IGGO R; PICKSLEY S; SOUTHGATE J ET AL., "Identification of a putative RNA helicase in E. coli", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1990), vol. 18, pages 5413 - 7, XP002120088 | - YANG L; LIN C; LIU ZR, "Phosphorylations of DEAD box p68 RNA helicase are associated with cancer development and cell proliferation", MOL CANCER RES, (2005), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1158/1541-7786.MCR-05-0022, pages 355 - 63, XP002993992 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1541-7786.MCR-05-0022 | - CHEN Q; LIN J; QIAN J; YAO DM ET AL., "Gene expression of helicase antigen in patients with acute and chronic myeloid leukaemia", ZHONGGUO SHI YAN XUE YE XUEZAZHI, (2011), vol. 19, pages 1171 - 5 | - ZHENG L; XIE G; DUAN G ET AL., "High expression of testes-specific protease 50 is associated with poor prognosis in colorectal carcinoma", PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, page E22203 | - KIM J; REBER HA; HINES OJ ET AL., "The clinical significance of MAGEA3 expression in pancreatic cancer", INT J CANCER, (2006), vol. 118, pages 2269 - 2275 | - RIENER MO; WILD PJ; SOLL C ET AL., "Frequent expression of the novel cancer testis antigen MAGE-C2/CT-10 in hepatocellular carcinoma", INT J CANCER, (2009), vol. 124, pages 352 - 357 | - VELAZQUEZ EF; JUNGBLUTH AA; YANCOVITZ M ET AL., "Expression of the cancer/testis antigen NY-ESO-1 in primary and metastaticmalignant melanoma (MM)-correlation with prognostic factors", CANCER IMMUN, (2007), vol. 7, page 11 | - SHIN S; ROSSOW KL; GRANDE JP ET AL., "Involvement of RNA helicases p68 and p72 in colon cancer", CANCER RESEARCH, (2007), vol. 67, pages 7572 - 7578 | - WORTHAM NC; AHAMED E; NICOL SM ET AL., "The DEAD-box protein p72 regulates ER alpha-/oestrogen-dependent transcription and cell growth, and is associated with improved survival in ER alpha-positive BC", ONCOGENE, (2009), vol. 28, pages 4053 - 4064 | - ISSA JP; GARCIA-MANERO G; GILES FJ ET AL., "Phase 1 study of low-dose prolonged exposure schedules of the hypomethylating agent 5-aza-2'-deoxycytidine (decitabine) in hematopoietic malignancies", BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, pages 1635 - 40 |