EP2903418 - AUTOMATIC MILKING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DeLaval Holding AB P.O. Box 39 147 21 Tumba / SE | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANGLART, Dorota Ringvägen 41 S-147 70 Grödinge / SE | 02 /
BOSMA, Epke Skelte van Aysmastrjitte 9 NL-8744 EN Schettens / NL | 03 /
FORSBERG, Mats Torsvägen 11 S-749 60 Örsundsbro / SE | 04 /
HÄLLMAN, Jonas Syrsavägen 4a S-184 38 Åkersberga / SE | 05 /
LUNDH, Andrés Spennarslingan 18 Nygårds Hagar S-155 93 Nykvarn / SE | 06 /
PERSSON, Staffan Solparksvägen 10 S-147 32 Tumba / SE | 07 /
ÖHMAN, Ulrika Backebogatan 3A S-129 40 Hägersten / SE | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Lilliehorn, Tobias, et al DeLaval International AB Intellectual Property Support Legal Affairs P.O.Box 39 147 21 Tumba / SE | [2017/30] |
Former [2015/33] | Keijser Bergöö, Malin Katarina DeLaval International AB Intellectual Property Support Legal Affairs Box 39 147 21 Tumba / SE | Application number, filing date | 13715776.4 | 15.03.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013SE50279 | Priority number, date | GB20120017818 | 04.10.2012 Original published format: GB 201217818 | US201261709377P | 04.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261709377 P | [2015/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014055004 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903418 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2903418 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2014 | Supplementary international search report - requested on: | RU | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/007, A01J5/013, A01J5/017 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
A01J5/007 (EP);
A01J5/003 (EP);
A01J5/013 (EP);
A01J5/0175 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE MELKANORDNUNG | [2015/33] | English: | AUTOMATIC MILKING ARRANGEMENT | [2015/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITE AUTOMATIQUE | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 26.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 15.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2013 | AL | 26.07.2017 | AT | 26.07.2017 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | DK | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | ES | 26.07.2017 | FI | 26.07.2017 | HR | 26.07.2017 | IT | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | LV | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | MK | 26.07.2017 | PL | 26.07.2017 | PT | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | RS | 26.07.2017 | SE | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | SM | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | NO | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | LU | 15.03.2018 | MT | 15.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | FR | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 15.03.2013 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MK | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2018 | ||
MT | 15.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.03.2013 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2018 | ||
MT | 15.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2018 | ||
MT | 15.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2018 | ||
MT | 15.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2018 | ||
MT | 15.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | |
NO | 26.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]SU1701198 (SEV KAVKAZSKIJ NII ZHIVOTNOVOD [SU]); | [A]RU2226822 ; | [A]RU2053653 (VSEROSSIJSKIJ NI I PT I MEKH I [RU]) | International search | [Y]EP1523880 (LELY ENTPR AG [CH]) [Y] 1-4,9-19,22-33,37-78 * figures 21,a,21b,24,25 * * column 77, lines 18-22 * * paragraphs [0089] , [0331] *; | [Y]WO0004768 (ALFA LAVAL AGRI AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-4,9-19,22-33,37-78 * claim 9 * * page 1, lines 20-24 * * page 2, lines 1-10 *; | [Y]DE102006053194 (FOERSTER TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 18,19 * figure 2 *; | [Y]EP1523878 (LELY ENTPR AG [CH]) [Y] 26,37 * paragraphs [0012] , [0018] *; | [Y]EP1336337 (LELY ENTPR AG [CH]) [Y] 57 * paragraph [0060]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2011017323 (HERBST EWA [US]) [Y] 27,64 * paragraph [0012]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO02100164 (DELAVAL HOLDING AB [SE], et al) [Y] 32,33 * figure 2 *; | [Y]WO9532614 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [Y] 41,42 * figure 1 * |