EP2838883 - NEW PHENYL-TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2017/45] |
Former [2015/09] | For all designated states F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AEBI, Johannes Im Kugelfang 27 4102 Binningen / CH | 02 /
AMREIN, Kurt Lettenweg 8 4452 Itingen / CH | 03 /
HORNSPERGER, Benoît 9, rue des Sources 68130 Altkirch / FR | 04 /
KUHN, Bernd Hinterlindenweg 26a 4153 Reinach BL / CH | 05 /
LIU, Yonfu Room 303, No. 5, Lane 652 Kongjiang Road Yangpu District Shanghai, 200093 / CN | 06 /
MAERKI, Hans P. Seltisbergerstrasse 75 4059 Basel / CH | 07 /
MARTIN, Rainer E. Vogesenstrasse 47 4056 Basel / CH | 08 /
MAYWEG, Alexander V. Unit 101, Block 6, 99 Dong Xiu Road Pudong New District Shanghai, 200127 / CN | 09 /
MOHR, Peter benkenstrasse 26 4054 Basel / CH | 10 /
TAN, Xuefei Room 101, No. 20 Lane 300, Jinxiu Road Pudong Shanghai, 200135 / CN | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Bernard, Guillaume F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2015/09] | Application number, filing date | 13716291.3 | 15.04.2013 | [2017/45] | WO2013EP57761 | Priority number, date | WO2012CN74170 | 17.04.2012 Original published format: PCT/CN2012/074170 | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013156423 | Date: | 24.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2838883 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2838883 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D217/22, C07D217/24, C07D221/16, A61K31/472, A61K31/435, A61P9/12 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
C07D217/14 (EP,US);
C07D217/22 (EP,CN,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/42 (EP);
A61P5/46 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D217/24 (EP,CN,US);
C07D221/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE PHENYLTETRAHYDROISOCHINOLIN-DERIVATE | [2015/09] | English: | NEW PHENYL-TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINE DERIVATIVES | [2015/09] | French: | NOUVEAUX DÉRIVÉS DE PHÉNYL-TÉTRAHYDROISOQUINOLINE | [2015/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 05.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.11.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 23.11.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.12.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.11.2017 | CY | 08.11.2017 | EE | 08.11.2017 | LV | 08.11.2017 | MC | 08.11.2017 | MK | 08.11.2017 | SM | 08.11.2017 | IS | 08.03.2018 | LU | 15.04.2018 | MT | 15.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | CY | 08.11.2017 | |
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
LU | 15.04.2018 | ||
MT | 15.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CY | 08.11.2017 | |
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
LU | 15.04.2018 | ||
MT | 15.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 08.11.2017 | |
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
LU | 15.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 08.11.2017 | |
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 08.11.2017 | |
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | LV | 08.11.2017 | |
IS | 08.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009135651 (UNIV SAARLANDES [DE], et al) [A] 1-49 * page 1, line 5 - line 9 * * page 4, line 31 - page 8, line 22 * * claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2009221591 (HARTMANN ROLF W [DE], et al) [A] 1-49 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0192] * * table 2 * * claim 18 * | by applicant | - J. 1. LEVIN; S. M. WEINREB, J. ORG. CHEM., (1984), vol. 49, page 4325 | - F. BESSELIÈVRE; F. MAHUTEAU-BETZER; D. S. GRIERSON; S. PIGUEL, J. ORG. CHEM., (2008), vol. 73, page 3278 | - N. A. STROTMAN; H. R. CHOBANIAN; Y. GUO; J. HE; J. E. WILSON, ORG. LETT., (2010), vol. 12, page 3578 | - M. P. DOYLE; L. J. WESTRUM; W. N. E. WOLTHUIS; M. M. SEE; W. P. BOONE; V. BAGHERI; M. M. PEARSON, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1993), vol. 115, page 958 | - A. J. CATINO; J. M. NICHOLS; H. CHOI; S. GOTTIPAMULA; M. P. DOYLE, ORG. LETT., (2005), vol. 7, page 5167 | - M. P. DOYLE ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1993), vol. 115, pages 958 - 964 |