EP2812115 - MICROPOWDER AND MOLDING CONTAINING A ZEOLITIC MATERIAL CONTAINING TI AND ZN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2017/20] |
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARVULESCU, Andrei-Nicolae Theaterstrasse 14 69117 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Ulrich Am Stecken 14a 67435 Neustadt / DE | 03 /
TELES, Joaquim Henrique Immanuel-Kant-Str. 28 67165 Waldsee / DE | 04 /
SEELIG, Bianca Blankenheimerstr. 40 50937 Köln / DE | 05 /
KAMPE, Philip Lange Koepoortstraat 49 B-2000 Antwerpen / BE | 06 /
WEBER, Markus Ruppertsberger Str. 7 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 07 /
BAYER, Robert Steinsfurter Str. 4 74889 Sinsheim / DE | 08 /
SEIDEL, Karsten Brentanostr. 31 68199 Mannheim / DE | 09 /
RESCH, Peter Hauptstr. 57 67310 Hettenleidelheim / DE | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2017/20] |
Former [2014/51] | Altmann, Andreas Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13716733.4 | 05.02.2013 | [2017/20] | WO2013EP52223 | Priority number, date | EP20120154168 | 07.02.2012 Original published format: EP 12154168 | [2014/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013117536 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2812115 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2812115 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/70, B01J29/74, B01J29/89, B01J35/00, B01J35/02, B01J35/10, B01J37/00, B01J37/02, B01J39/02, C01B37/00, C01B39/02, C01B39/06, C01B39/08, C01B39/12, C07D301/12 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
B01J29/7088 (EP);
B01J29/89 (EP,CN,KR,RU);
B01J29/70 (KR);
B01J29/7476 (EP);
B01J35/30 (EP,CN);
B01J35/31 (EP);
B01J35/40 (EP,CN);
B01J35/60 (KR,RU);
B01J35/647 (CN);
B01J37/00 (RU);
B01J37/0009 (CN);
B01J37/0045 (EP,CN);
B01J37/02 (KR);
B01J37/08 (CN);
B01J37/10 (CN);
C01B37/00 (KR,RU);
C01B37/005 (EP);
C01B39/026 (EP);
C01B39/06 (EP);
C01B39/085 (EP);
C01B39/12 (EP);
C07D301/12 (EP,CN,KR,RU);
C07D303/04 (CN);
B01J2229/186 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/51] | B01J29/89, B01J35/10, B01J37/00, B01J37/02, C01B37/00, C07D301/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROPULVER MIT EINEM ZEOLITHISCHEN MATERIAL MIT TI UND ZN | [2017/03] | English: | MICROPOWDER AND MOLDING CONTAINING A ZEOLITIC MATERIAL CONTAINING TI AND ZN | [2014/51] | French: | MICRO-POUDRE CONTENANT UN MATÉRIAU DE TYPE ZÉOLITHIQUE CONTENANT DU TI ET ZN | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/51] | MIKROPULVER UND FORMUNG MIT EINEM ZEOLITHISCHEN MATERIAL MIT TI UND ZN | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 20.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17164766.2 / EP3216520 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.02.2013 | AL | 17.05.2017 | AT | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | DK | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | HR | 17.05.2017 | LT | 17.05.2017 | LV | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | MK | 17.05.2017 | PL | 17.05.2017 | PT | 17.05.2017 | RO | 17.05.2017 | RS | 17.05.2017 | SE | 17.05.2017 | SI | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | SM | 17.05.2017 | TR | 17.05.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | NO | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | IE | 05.02.2018 | LU | 05.02.2018 | MT | 05.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 05.02.2013 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 05.02.2018 | ||
LU | 05.02.2018 | ||
MT | 05.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 05.02.2013 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 05.02.2018 | ||
LU | 05.02.2018 | ||
MT | 05.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 05.02.2018 | ||
LU | 05.02.2018 | ||
MT | 05.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 05.02.2018 | ||
LU | 05.02.2018 | ||
MT | 05.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 05.02.2018 | ||
LU | 05.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [YDA]JP2008200553 ; | [A]EP0930308 (ENICHEM SPA [IT]); | [A]US2005171364 (ONIMUS WILSON H [US], et al); | [YD]US2007043226 (MULLER ULRICH [DE], et al); | [A]WO2010087519 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al); | [YA]WO2011064191 (BASF SE [DE], et al); | by applicant | US6114551 | US6114552 | US6759540 | US7273826 | JP2008200553 | US7476770 | US7608728 |