EP2956608 - MOSQUITO NET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MV Line S.p.A. Via Umbria Lotto 69 Zona Industriale PIP 70021 Acquaviva Delle Fonti / IT | [2015/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTANARO, Paolo Via Giorgio Vasari 68 I-70010 Casamassima / IT | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (IT) Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 13717325.8 | 13.02.2013 | [2015/52] | WO2013IT00046 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014125509 | Date: | 21.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2956608 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/54, E06B9/58 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
E06B9/54 (EP);
E06B9/581 (EP);
E06B2009/524 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] | Title | German: | MOSKITONETZ | [2015/52] | English: | MOSQUITO NET | [2015/52] | French: | MOUSTIQUAIRE | [2015/52] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/52] | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/42] | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1766730 (CLIFFORD TRAUT) [Y] 10 * column 2, lines 121-129; figures 3-6 *; | [A]FR1379077 (MANUF DE STORES ET VOLETS ROUL) [A] 1-13 * page 1, column 2, line 37 - page 2, column 1, line 35; figures 1-4 *; | [A]AU562959B (PEARCE L N) [A] 1-13* page 5, line 7 - page 7, line 18; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]DE20016183U (OBERMEIER REINHARD [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * claim 1 *; | [XY]US6691761 (ALKHOURY BOULOS PAUL [CA], et al) [X] 1,4-9,12,13 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 34; figures 1-5 * * column 1, lines 53-55 * * page 2, lines 19-21 * [Y] 2,3,10,11; | [Y]EP2511467 (FAKRO PP SPOLKA ZOO [PL]) [Y] 11 * abstract * |