EP2803423 - COPPER TUBE FOR THE CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/47] | TUBE FOR THE END-CONSUMER, WITH MINIMUM INTERIOR AND EXTERIOR OXIDATION, WITH GRAINS THAT CAN BE SELECTED IN TERMS OF SIZE AND ORDER; AND TUBE-PRODUCTION PROCESS | ||
[2021/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states La Farga Tub, S.L. Carretera C-17z, Km 73.5 08509 Les Masies de Voltregà Barcelona / ES | [2023/23] |
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states La Farga Tub, S.L. Carretera C-17z, Km 73.5 08509 Les Masies de Voltregà Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2014/47] | For all designated states Madeco Mills S.A. San Francisco 4760 San Miguel, Santiago / CL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOREL RODRÍGUEZ, Eduardo Andrés Las Baleares 927 Las Condes Santiago / CL | 02 /
VALDEBENITO LÓPEZ, Eduardo Alfonso Raiffer 767 La Florida Santiago / CL | 03 /
CARRASCO GÁLVEZ, Marco Antonio Pasaje Alcázar 0206 Puente Alto Santiago / CL | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | Isern Patentes y Marcas S.L. Avda. Diagonal, 463 Bis, 2° 08036 Barcelona / ES | [2023/23] |
Former [2014/47] | Kalhammer, Georg, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13717409.0 | 04.02.2013 | [2023/23] | WO2013CL00007 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014117285 | Date: | 07.08.2014 | Language: | ES | [2014/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2803423 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2803423 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 07.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B21C1/24, B22D11/00, C22C9/00 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
B22D11/006 (EP,US);
B22D11/004 (EP,US);
C22C9/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/131 (EP,US);
Y10T428/139 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/47] | B21C1/24, B22D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUPFER-ROHR FÜR DIE BAUINDUSTRIE UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/40] | English: | COPPER TUBE FOR THE CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING IT | [2022/40] | French: | TUBE EN CUIVRE POUR L'INDUSTRIE DE LA CONSTRUCTION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/40] |
Former [2014/47] | ROHR FÜR ENDVERBRAUCHER MIT MINIMALER INNEREN UND ÄUSSEREN OXIDATION, MIT KÖRNERN, DIE BEZÜGLICH DER GRÖSSE UND REIHENFOLGE AUSGEWÄHLT WERDEN KÖNNEN, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ROHRS | ||
Former [2014/47] | TUBE FOR THE END-CONSUMER, WITH MINIMUM INTERIOR AND EXTERIOR OXIDATION, WITH GRAINS THAT CAN BE SELECTED IN TERMS OF SIZE AND ORDER; AND TUBE-PRODUCTION PROCESS | ||
Former [2014/47] | TUBE POUR CONSOMMATEUR FINAL, À OXYDATION INTERNE ET EXTERNE MINIMALE, À TAILLE ET DISPOSITION DE GRAINS POUVANT ÊTRE SÉLECTIONNÉES, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DESDITS TUBES | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2013 | Translation filed | 29.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: ES | 13.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 03.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 08.12.2015 | Observations by third parties | 11.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 03.06.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 03.06.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.06.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6106764 (EBNER PETER [AT]) [Y] 5-14* column 1, lines 10-14 *; | [X]EP2055795 (KOBELCO & MAT COPPER TUBE INC [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0041] - [0046]; claims 1,5 *; | [Y] - UPCAST OY, "New UPCAST Developments Target Copper Tube Production and Environmental Benefits", TECHNOLOGY NEWS INTERNATIONAL 99/2010, (2010), pages 28 - 29, XP002755545 [Y] 5-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4876870 (RANTANEN MAURI V [FI]); | [A]US5279353 (NIELSEN SR WILLIAM D [US], et al); | [A]WO0164372 (S I T A I S P A SOCIETA ITALIA [IT], et al); | [A]WO2008072787 (CTA TECHNOLOGY PROPRIETARY LTD [ZA], et al) | by applicant | WO2012CL00013 |