EP2836289 - CONTAINER FOR WATER AND HOLLOW FIBRE FILTER MODULE THEREFORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lifesaver IP Limited Albion Works Uttoxeter Road Longton Stoke-on-Trent Staffordshire ST3 1PH / GB | [2021/03] |
Former [2016/09] | For all designated states Lifesaver IP Limited Albion Works, Uttoxeter Road Longton, Stoke-on-Trent GB-Staffordshire ST3 1PH / GB | ||
Former [2015/08] | For all designated states Pritchard IP Limited 47 Butt Road Colchester, Essex CO3 3BZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRITCHARD, Michael William Godfreys Rectory Road Langham Colchester Essex CO4 5PW / GB | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2021/46] |
Former [2015/08] | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 13718614.4 | 09.04.2013 | [2021/46] | WO2013GB50907 | Priority number, date | MY2012PI700167 | 09.04.2012 Original published format: MYPI2012700167 | [2015/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013153370 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2836289 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2836289 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D63/04, C02F1/44, C02F1/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
B01D63/04 (EP,GB,US);
B01D69/08 (GB);
C02F1/001 (EP,US);
C02F1/002 (GB);
C02F1/44 (EP,GB,US);
B01D2311/04 (EP,GB,US);
B01D2311/2649 (EP,GB,US);
B01D2313/06 (EP,GB,US);
B01D2313/243 (EP,GB,US);
B01D2313/44 (EP,GB,US);
B01D2313/50 (EP,GB,US);
B01D2319/04 (US);
B01D2325/36 (GB);
C02F1/283 (GB);
C02F2103/06 (US);
| C-Set: |
B01D2311/04, B01D2311/2649 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/08] | B01D63/04, C02F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR WASSER UND HOHLFASERFILTERMODUL DAFÜR | [2015/08] | English: | CONTAINER FOR WATER AND HOLLOW FIBRE FILTER MODULE THEREFORE | [2015/08] | French: | CONTENEUR À EAU ET FILTRE À FIBRES CREUSES ASSOCIÉ | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 26.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.11.2020 | 26.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2013 | AL | 17.11.2021 | CY | 17.11.2021 | EE | 17.11.2021 | HR | 17.11.2021 | LT | 17.11.2021 | LV | 17.11.2021 | MC | 17.11.2021 | MK | 17.11.2021 | MT | 17.11.2021 | RO | 17.11.2021 | RS | 17.11.2021 | SI | 17.11.2021 | SM | 17.11.2021 | BG | 17.02.2022 | GR | 18.02.2022 | IS | 17.03.2022 | PT | 17.03.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 09.04.2013 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
MK | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 09.04.2013 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 09.04.2013 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 17.11.2021 | |
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | HR | 17.11.2021 | |
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | HR | 17.11.2021 | |
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | LT | 17.11.2021 | |
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 17.11.2021 | |
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 17.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5282964 (YOUNG THOMAS C [US], et al); | [XAYI]JPH08302762 (TORAY INDUSTRIES, et al); | [A]JPH1129962 (HITACHI TECHNO ENG, et al); | [Y]WO03014025 (INNOVA PURE WATER INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2005030374 (KOCH MEMBRANE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al); | [XYI]EP2213363 (SECCUA GMBH DEUTSCHLAND [DE]); | [XYI]WO2010091467 (AQUA RES PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [XYI]GB2473256 (PRITCHARD MICHAEL [GB]); | [XI]GB2480582 (PRITCHARD IP LTD [GB]) | Examination | JPH06327905 | by applicant | WO2008037969 |