EP2831111 - ANG2-BINDING MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | [2019/06] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORGES, Eric BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM GMBH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | 02 /
GSCHWIND, Andreas BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM GMBH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | 03 /
OTT, Rene Georg BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM GMBH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | 04 /
BUYSE, Marie-Ange Burg. E. Ronsestraat 23 9820 Merelbeke / BE | 05 /
BOUCNEAU, Joachim Elsboslaan 41 9840 De Pinte / BE | 06 /
MERCHIERS, Pascal Loopstraat 23 2460 Kasterlee / BE | 07 /
DEPLA, Erik Burgstraat 58 9070 Destelbergen / BE | 08 /
STEVENAERT, Frederik Kerkemstraat 11 9680 Maarkedal / BE | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Weik, Steffen, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2019/12] |
Former [2015/06] | Weik, Steffen Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 13718796.9 | 27.03.2013 | [2019/12] | WO2013EP56635 | Priority number, date | EP20120162615 | 30.03.2012 Original published format: EP 12162615 | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013144266 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2831111 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2831111 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/22, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
C07K16/22 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/3038 (IL,US);
A61K39/3955 (IL,US);
A61K45/06 (IL,US);
A61P13/12 (EP,IL);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/3015 (IL,US);
C07K16/303 (IL,US);
C07K16/3069 (IL,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/565 (IL,US);
C07K2317/567 (IL,US);
C07K2317/569 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANG2 BINDENDE MOLEKÜLE | [2018/30] | English: | ANG2-BINDING MOLECULES | [2015/06] | French: | MOLÉCULES LIANT ANG2 | [2018/30] |
Former [2015/06] | ANG2-BINDENDE MOLEKÜLE | ||
Former [2015/06] | MOLÉCULES DE LIAISON À ANG2 | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 12.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 20.03.2019 | [2019/52] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009147248 (ABLYNX NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2010066836 (ABLYNX NV [BE], et al) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * * in particular * * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 8, line 28 * * page 17, line 1 - page 22, line 27 * * page 218, line 1 - page 234, line 7 * * figures 1-17; examples 1-23; claims 1-15; sequences 464-471 *; | [AD]US2011027286 (THURSTON GAVIN [US], et al) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y] - WARK K L ET AL, "Latest technologies for the enhancement of antibody affinity", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 58, no. 5-6, doi:10.1016/J.ADDR.2006.01.025, ISSN 0169-409X, (20060807), pages 657 - 670, (20060807), XP024892147 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2006.01.025 | [Y] - CARTER P J, "POTENT ANTIBODY THERAPEUTICS BY DESIGN", NATURE REVIEWS. IMMUNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20060407), vol. 6, doi:10.1038/NRI1837, ISSN 1474-1733, pages 343 - 357, XP007901440 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nri1837 | [A] - REVETS H ET AL, "NANOBODIES AS NOVEL AGENTS FOR CANCER THERAPY", EXPERT OPINION ON BIOLOGICAL THERAPY, ASHLEY, LONDON, GB, (20050101), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1517/14712598.5.1.111, ISSN 1471-2598, pages 111 - 124, XP009076361 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/14712598.5.1.111 | by applicant | WO9404678 | US5643755 | WO9849185 | US6166185 | WO02056910 | WO03002609 | WO2004041862 | WO2004041863 | WO2004041865 | WO2004041867 | WO2004092215 | WO2005044858 | WO2006004678 | US2006018909 | WO2006040153 | US2006246071 | WO2006122786 | US7205275 | US2008014196 | WO2008020079 | WO2008101985 | US7521053 | US2009191212 | WO2009109635 | US2011027286 | - YANCOPOULOS ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 407, pages 242 - 248 | - AUGUSTIN ET AL., NAT REV MOL CELL BIOL., (200903), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 165 - 77 | - FALC6N ET AL., AM J PATHOL., (200911), vol. 175, no. 5, pages 2159 - 70 | - GOEDE ET AL., BR J CANCER., (20101026), vol. 103, no. 9, pages 1407 - 14 | - PARK ET AL., CHEST., (200707), vol. 132, no. 1, pages 200 - 6 | - HELFRICH ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (20090215), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 1384 - 92 | - FOLKMAN ET AL., NATURE, (1989), pages 339 - 58 | - FERRARA ET AL., NAT REV DRUG DISCOV., (200405), vol. 3, no. 5, pages 391 - 400 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), vol. 1-3 | - HAMERS-CASTERMAN C; ATARHOUCH T; MUYLDERMANS S; ROBINSON G; HAMERS C; SONGA EB; BENDAHMAN N; HAMERS R., "Naturally occurring antibodies devoid of light chains", NATURE, (1993), vol. 363, doi:doi:10.1038/363446a0, pages 446 - 448, XP002535892 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/363446a0 | - KABAT ET AL., Sequence of proteins of immunological interest, NIH BETHESDA, MD, PUBLICATION NO. 91 | - RIECHMANN; MUYLDERMANS, J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1999), vol. 231, pages 25 - 38 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - WARD, E.S. ET AL., "Binding activities of a repertoire of single immunoglobulin variable domains secreted from Escherichia coli", NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - HOLT, L.J. ET AL., "Domain antibodies: proteins for therapy", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 21, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tibtech.2003.08.007, pages 484 - 490, XP004467495 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2003.08.007 | - MARKS ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - BARBAS ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI, USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 3809 - 3813 | - SHIER ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 169, pages 147 - 155 | - YELTON ET AL., IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, pages 1994 - 2004 | - JACKSON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, no. 7, pages 3310 - 9 | - HAWKINS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 226, no. 3, pages 889 - 896 | - CHENG Y; KOH GY, "A designed angiopoietin-2 variant, pentameric COMP-Ang2, strongly activates Tie2 receptor and stimulated angiogensis", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2009), pages 772 - 780 | - DAUGHERTY ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 19, no. 9, pages 2471 - 2476 | - NICAISE, PROTEIN SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 13, pages 1882 - 1891 | - Handbook of Therapeutic Antibodies, WILEY, (2007), pages 252 - 255 | - MARTIN, E.W, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO | - ERICSSON ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2006), vol. 357, pages 289 - 298 |