EP2834578 - AN APPARATUS FOR VAPOURISING A MEDIUM AND SEPARATING DROPLETS AS WELL AS FOR CONDENSING THE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAHTERUS OY Pruukintie 7 23600 Kalanti / FI | [2015/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONTU, Mauri Vahteruksenraitti 22 FI-23660 Kalanti As. / FI | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy, Turku P.O. Box 99 Tykistökatu 2-4 B 20521 Turku / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy P.O. Box 99 Tykistökatu 2-4 B 20521 Turku / FI | ||
Former [2015/07] | Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy P.O. Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | Application number, filing date | 13718868.6 | 04.04.2013 | [2016/13] | WO2013FI00016 | Priority number, date | FI20120005383 | 04.04.2012 Original published format: FI 20125383 | [2015/07] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013150175 | Date: | 10.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2834578 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2834578 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D5/00, F25B1/00, F25B39/00, F28F9/00, F28D9/00, F28D21/00 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
F25B39/00 (EP,CN,US);
B01D5/0015 (US);
B01D1/28 (US);
B01D1/305 (US);
F25B1/005 (US);
F28D9/0006 (EP,US);
F28D9/0012 (EP,US);
F28D9/0043 (EP,US);
F28D9/0093 (EP,US);
F28F9/005 (EP,US);
F25B2339/02 (US);
F25B2339/0241 (EP,US);
F25B2339/04 (US);
F25B2339/041 (US);
F25B2400/23 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/07] | F25B39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZERSTÄUBEN EINES MEDIUMS UND TRENNUNG VON TRÖPFCHEN SOWIE ZUM KONDENSIEREN DES MEDIUMS | [2015/07] | English: | AN APPARATUS FOR VAPOURISING A MEDIUM AND SEPARATING DROPLETS AS WELL AS FOR CONDENSING THE MEDIUM | [2015/07] | French: | APPAREIL DESTINÉ À VAPORISER UN MILIEU ET À SÉPARER DES GOUTTELETTES, AINSI QU'À CONDENSER LE MILIEU | [2015/51] |
Former [2015/07] | APPAREIL DESTINÉ À VAPORISER UN MILIEU ET À SÉPARER DES GOUTTELETTES, AINSI QU'À DE CONDENSER LE MILIEU | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 31.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2013 | AL | 30.03.2016 | AT | 30.03.2016 | BE | 30.03.2016 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | CZ | 30.03.2016 | EE | 30.03.2016 | ES | 30.03.2016 | HR | 30.03.2016 | LT | 30.03.2016 | LV | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | MK | 30.03.2016 | NL | 30.03.2016 | PL | 30.03.2016 | RO | 30.03.2016 | RS | 30.03.2016 | SI | 30.03.2016 | SK | 30.03.2016 | SM | 30.03.2016 | TR | 30.03.2016 | IE | 04.04.2016 | LU | 04.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | NO | 30.06.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | IS | 30.07.2016 | PT | 01.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 04.04.2013 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BG | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 04.04.2013 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BG | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 04.04.2013 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 04.04.2013 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | HR | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | HR | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | HR | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | HR | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | HR | 30.03.2016 | |
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2839415 (LEMMENMEIER ROLAND AG) [A] 1-14* figures 1-2 *; | [A]US4437322 (ERTINGER RICHARD E [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0901602 (ALENKO AG [CH]) [Y] 1,2,8,11,14 * figures 1, 2, 5, 6 *; | [IY]US6158238 (LAMPINEN MARKKU [FI], et al) [I] 3-7,9,10,12,13 * figures 6-9 * * column 4, lines 28-36 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 4 * * column 6, lines 24-26 * [Y] 1,2,8,11,14 |