EP2842330 - VIDEO PROJECTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RED.COM, LLC 34 Parker Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2017/34] |
Former [2015/10] | For all designated states RED.COM, INC. 34 Parker Irvine, CA 92618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDBERG, Edmund 17957 Andrew Street Monte Sereno, CA 95030 / US | 02 /
JANNARD, James, H. 34 Parker Irvine, CA 92618 / US | 03 /
ENGLISH, Stuart, J. 2 Santa Inez Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US | 04 /
PRIOR, Gregory, Alan 1189 Utopia P1 San Jose, CA 95127 / US | 05 /
NEWHAM, Ryan 42 Bijou Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2018/35] |
Former [2015/10] | 01 /
SANDBERG, Edmund 17957 Andrew Street Monte Sereno, CA 95030 / US | ||
02 /
JANNARD, James, H. 15 Wild Ridge Las Vegas, NV 89135 / US | |||
03 /
ENGLISH, Stuart, J. 2 Santa Inez Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US | |||
04 /
PRIOR, Gregory, Alan 1189 Utopia P1 San Jose, CA 95127 / US | |||
05 /
NEWHAM, Ryan 42 Bijou Irvine, CA 92618 / US | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 13718968.4 | 11.04.2013 | [2018/35] | WO2013US36196 | Priority number, date | US201261624167P | 13.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261624167 P | US201261720295P | 30.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261720295 P | US201361780958P | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361780958 P | US201361809268P | 05.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361809268 P | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013155319 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2842330 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2842330 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31, G02B27/26, G03B21/20, H04N13/363, G02B26/12, G02B6/06, G02B27/48, G03B33/00, F21V8/00, G03B21/00 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
H04N13/363 (EP,US);
H04N9/3164 (US);
G02B26/123 (EP,US);
G02B27/48 (EP,US);
G02B30/25 (EP,US);
G02B6/0005 (US);
G02B6/06 (US);
G03B21/00 (US);
G03B21/005 (EP,US);
G03B21/206 (EP,US);
G03B33/00 (EP,US);
H04N13/324 (EP,US);
H04N9/3108 (US);
H04N9/3117 (EP,US);
H04N9/3144 (US);
H04N9/315 (US);
H04N9/3155 (US);
H04N9/3161 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/10] | H04N9/31, G02B27/26, G03B21/00, H04N13/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIDEOPROJEKTORSYSTEM | [2015/10] | English: | VIDEO PROJECTOR SYSTEM | [2015/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROJECTEUR VIDÉO | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 24.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.03.2018 | 15.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2013 | AL | 29.08.2018 | AT | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | CZ | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | HR | 29.08.2018 | LT | 29.08.2018 | LV | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | MK | 29.08.2018 | MT | 29.08.2018 | PL | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | RS | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | SM | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | IS | 29.12.2018 | PT | 29.12.2018 | IE | 11.04.2019 | LU | 11.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 11.04.2013 | |
AL | 29.08.2018 | ||
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 11.04.2019 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.04.2013 | |
AL | 29.08.2018 | ||
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 11.04.2019 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 11.04.2019 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 11.04.2019 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 11.04.2019 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | HR | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | LT | 29.08.2018 | |
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 29.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2002159036 (YAMAGISHI SHIGEKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document * [Y] 17-21; | [YA]EP1337117 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]) [Y] 17-21 * the whole document *[A] 1-16 | Examination | US2002180932 | US2009284713 |