EP2688927 - CATALYTIC CONVERSION OF HYDROXYPROPIONIC ACID OR ITS DERIVATIVES TO ACRYLIC ACID OR ITS DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2014/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINGOES, Janette, Villalobos One Procter&Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45201 / US | 02 /
VELASQUEZ, Juan, Esteban One Procter&Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45201 / US | 03 /
GODLEWSKI, Jane, Ellen One Procter&Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45201 / US | 04 /
COLLIAS, Dimitris, Ioannis One Procter&Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45201 / US | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 13719329.8 | 11.04.2013 | [2015/50] | WO2013US36161 | Priority number, date | US201261623054P | 11.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261623054 P | US201313760472 | 06.02.2013 Original published format: US201313760472 | [2014/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013155295 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2688927 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2688927 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/06, A61L15/60, C08L33/02, C07C57/04 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
B01J27/1806 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C07C51/377 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61F13/534 (US);
B01J27/16 (EP,RU,US);
B01J27/18 (RU);
B01J27/1804 (CN);
B01J27/1808 (CN);
B01J27/1811 (EP,CN,US);
B01J27/1817 (EP,CN,US);
B01J27/182 (CN);
B01J27/1853 (EP,CN,US);
B01J27/1856 (EP,CN,US);
B01J27/186 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01J27/187 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01J27/188 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01J27/195 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01J27/198 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01J27/25 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01J35/60 (RU);
B01J37/0036 (EP,CN,US);
B01J37/03 (RU);
B01J37/04 (RU,US);
B01J37/08 (US);
C07C51/09 (RU,US);
C07C51/44 (US);
C07C51/48 (RU,US);
C07C57/04 (RU,US);
C08F2/10 (US);
C08F220/06 (RU);
C08L33/02 (RU);
A61F13/53 (US);
A61F2013/530489 (US);
A61F2013/530496 (US);
B01J2523/00 (CN);
B01J2523/12 (CN);
B01J2523/13 (CN);
B01J2523/23 (CN);
B01J2523/25 (CN);
B01J2523/51 (CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/377, C07C57/04 (CN,EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYTISCHE UMWANDLUNG VON HYDROXYPROPIONSÄURE ODER IHREN DERIVATEN IN ACRYLSÄURE ODER DERIVATE DAVON | [2014/05] | English: | CATALYTIC CONVERSION OF HYDROXYPROPIONIC ACID OR ITS DERIVATIVES TO ACRYLIC ACID OR ITS DERIVATIVES | [2014/05] | French: | CONVERSION CATALYTIQUE D'ACIDE HYDROXYPROPIONIQUE OU DE SES DÉRIVÉS EN ACIDE ACRYLIQUE OU SES DÉRIVÉS | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 16.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2013 | AL | 09.12.2015 | AT | 09.12.2015 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | CZ | 09.12.2015 | DK | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | HR | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | LV | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | MK | 09.12.2015 | PL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | RS | 09.12.2015 | SE | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | SM | 09.12.2015 | TR | 09.12.2015 | NO | 09.03.2016 | GR | 10.03.2016 | IS | 09.04.2016 | IE | 11.04.2016 | LU | 11.04.2016 | PT | 11.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 11.04.2013 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
IE | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 11.04.2013 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
IE | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 11.04.2013 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
IE | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.04.2013 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
IE | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
IE | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 09.12.2015 | |
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 09.12.2015 | |
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 09.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4729978 (SAWICKI ROBERT A [US]); | [A]WO03082795 (CARGILL INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US4786756 | CN20091054519 |