EP2819647 - POLY (N ACRYLOYL GLYCINAMIDE) ASSOCIATED WITH AT LEAST AN ACTIVE AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/02] | ASSOCIATION OF POLY(N-ACRYLOYL GLYCINAMIDE) WITH AT LEAST ONE ACTIVE PRINCIPLE | ||
[2017/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states Institut Regional du Cancer de Montpellier Parc Euromédecine 31, rue de la Croix Verte PB 505 F-34298 Montpellier Cedex 5 / FR | For all designated states Université de Montpellier 163 rue Auguste Broussonnet 34090 Montpellier / FR | [2017/47] |
Former [2015/02] | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Institut Regional du Cancer de Montpellier Parc Euromédecine 31, rue de la Croix Verte PB 505 F-34298 Montpellier Cedex 5 / FR | |||
For all designated states Université Montpellier 1 5 boulevard Henri IV 34967 Montpellier Cedex 2 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUSTTA, Mahfoud 9 rue des Casernes F-34570 Pignan / FR | 02 /
COLOMBO, Pierre-Emmanuel 7 rue André Chamson F-34830 Clapiers / FR | 03 /
VERT, Michel 8 rue du Maréchal Lefebvre F-34170 Castelnau-le-Lez / FR | [2017/31] |
Former [2015/02] | 01 /
BOUSTTA, Mahfoud 9 rue des Casernes F-34570 Pignan / FR | ||
02 /
COLOMBO, Pierre-Emmanuel 308 avenue de Fes F-34080 Montpellier / FR | |||
03 /
VERT, Michel 8 rue du Maréchal Lefebvre F-34170 Castelnau-le-Lez / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2015/02] | Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13720033.3 | 26.02.2013 | [2017/31] | WO2013IB51536 | Priority number, date | FR20120051765 | 27.02.2012 Original published format: FR 1251765 | [2015/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013128373 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2819647 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2819647 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/06, A61K47/32, A61K9/00, A61J1/20, A61K9/10, A61K49/04 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61J1/2093 (US);
A61K49/04 (US);
A61K49/0404 (EP,US);
A61K49/0409 (EP,US);
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/02] | A61K9/06, A61K47/32, A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLY (N ACRYLOYL GLYCINAMIDE) IN ASSOZIATION MIT WENIGSTENS EINEM WIRKSTOFF | [2017/14] | English: | POLY (N ACRYLOYL GLYCINAMIDE) ASSOCIATED WITH AT LEAST AN ACTIVE AGENT | [2017/11] | French: | ASSOCIATION DE POLY(N ACRYLOYL GLYCINAMIDE) AVEC AU MOINS UN PRINCIPE ACTIF | [2015/02] |
Former [2015/02] | ASSOZIATION VON POLY-(N-ACRYLOYL-GLYCINAMID) MIT MINDESTENS EINEM WIRKSTOFF | ||
Former [2015/02] | ASSOCIATION OF POLY(N-ACRYLOYL GLYCINAMIDE) WITH AT LEAST ONE ACTIVE PRINCIPLE | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 12.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2013 | AL | 02.08.2017 | AT | 02.08.2017 | CY | 02.08.2017 | CZ | 02.08.2017 | DK | 02.08.2017 | EE | 02.08.2017 | FI | 02.08.2017 | HR | 02.08.2017 | LT | 02.08.2017 | LV | 02.08.2017 | MC | 02.08.2017 | MK | 02.08.2017 | MT | 02.08.2017 | NL | 02.08.2017 | PL | 02.08.2017 | PT | 02.08.2017 | RO | 02.08.2017 | RS | 02.08.2017 | SE | 02.08.2017 | SI | 02.08.2017 | SK | 02.08.2017 | SM | 02.08.2017 | TR | 02.08.2017 | BG | 02.11.2017 | NO | 02.11.2017 | GR | 03.11.2017 | IS | 02.12.2017 | IE | 26.02.2018 | LU | 26.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 26.02.2013 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 26.02.2013 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 02.08.2017 | |
NO | 02.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US7976728 (EGUCHI MASARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,16,17 * column 9, lines 18-20; examples 1-5 * [Y] 5-8,15; | [XI]JP2008220868 (GE MED SYS GLOBAL TECH CO LLC) [X] 1,9-14 * the whole document * [I] 15-18; | [XY]EP1312627 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,9-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 9] - [0010]; examples 5-6 * [Y] 5-8,15 | [XI] - KUILIN DENG ET AL, "A pH/Thermo-responsive injectable hydrogel system based on Poly(N-acryloylglycine) as drug carrier", IRANIAN POLYMER JOURNAL, (2011), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 185 - 194, XP002683974 [X] 1-4,10-15 * the whole document * [I] 5-9,16-18 | by applicant | US2009053276 | US3396030 | - AGUILAR ET AL., "Smart Polymers and Their Applications as Biomaterials", TOPICS IN TISSUE ENGINEERING, (2007), vol. 3 | - HASS ET AL., "Thermally reversible homopolymer gel systems", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, (1964), vol. 2, no. 12, page 1095 | - HAAS ET AL., "DifJerential thermal analysis of thermally reversible gels", ANAL. CALORIMETRY, PROC. SYMP., (1970), vol. 2, page 211 | - KUILIN DENG ET AL., IRANIAN POLYMER JOURNAL, (2011), vol. 20, no. 3, page 185 | - GLATZEL S. ET AL., "Well-defined uncharged polymers with a sharp UCST in water and in physiological milieu", MACROMOLECULES, (2011), vol. 44, page 413 | - PURE AND APPLIED CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 76, page 1985 | - "Definition of terms related to polymer blends, composites, and multiphase polymeric materials", IUPAC RECOMMENDATIONS, (2004), page 1999 | - HAAS ET AL., "Synthetic thermally reversible gel systems", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER PHYSICS EDITION, II, (1967), vol. 5, no. 5, page 915 | - HAAS ET AL., "Synthetic thermally reversible gel systems", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, IV, PART A-L, POLYMER CHEMISTRY, (1970), vol. 8, no. 5, page 1213 | - HAAS ET AL., JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, (1964), vol. 2, no. 12, page 1095 | - GLATZEL ET AL., "Well-defined synthetic polymers with a protein-like gélation behavior in water", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (2010), vol. 45, page 4517 | - "Comprehensive Polymer science", C.A. BARSON, Chain Polymerization I, PERGAMON PRESS, (1989), vol. 3, page 173 | - H.C. HASS; R.I. MAC DONALD; A.N. SCHUELER, J. POLYM. SCI., (1970), vol. 8, page 1213 |