EP2825478 - CONTAINER, IN PARTICULAR FOR FOOD USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neolid 23 rue Dumenge 69004 Lyon / FR | [2015/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FROLIN, Nicolas 7 rue de Belfort F-69004 Lyon / FR | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Jeannet, Olivier JEANNET & Associés 26 Quai Claude Bernard 69007 Lyon / FR | [2015/04] | Application number, filing date | 13720063.0 | 11.03.2013 | [2016/10] | WO2013IB51914 | Priority number, date | FR20120052375 | 16.03.2012 Original published format: FR 1252375 | [2015/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013136253 | Date: | 19.09.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2825478 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2825478 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/16, B65D47/20, B65D51/00 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
B65D47/2018 (EP,US);
B65D47/2025 (US);
A47G19/2222 (EP);
A47G19/2266 (EP);
A47G19/2272 (US);
A47G19/2288 (EP,US);
B65D51/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER, INSBESONDERE FÜR LEBENSMITTEL | [2015/04] | English: | CONTAINER, IN PARTICULAR FOR FOOD USE | [2015/04] | French: | RÉCIPIENT, NOTAMMENT À USAGE ALIMENTAIRE | [2015/04] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 16.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2013 | AL | 09.03.2016 | AT | 09.03.2016 | CY | 09.03.2016 | CZ | 09.03.2016 | DK | 09.03.2016 | EE | 09.03.2016 | ES | 09.03.2016 | FI | 09.03.2016 | HR | 09.03.2016 | IT | 09.03.2016 | LT | 09.03.2016 | LV | 09.03.2016 | MC | 09.03.2016 | MK | 09.03.2016 | MT | 09.03.2016 | NL | 09.03.2016 | PL | 09.03.2016 | RO | 09.03.2016 | RS | 09.03.2016 | SE | 09.03.2016 | SI | 09.03.2016 | SK | 09.03.2016 | SM | 09.03.2016 | TR | 09.03.2016 | IE | 11.03.2016 | LU | 11.03.2016 | BG | 09.06.2016 | NO | 09.06.2016 | GR | 10.06.2016 | IS | 09.07.2016 | PT | 11.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 11.03.2013 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
MT | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
TR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.03.2016 | ||
LU | 11.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 11.03.2013 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
MT | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.03.2016 | ||
LU | 11.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MT | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 09.03.2016 | |
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005082248 (AL-JADDA OMAR [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]FR2922195 (FROLIN NOCOLAS [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | US2005082248 | FR2922195 |