EP2839271 - MOBILE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ANALYSING BREATH SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enose Holding B.V. Industrieweg 85 7202 CA Zutphen / NL | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOS, Albert Arnhemsestraat 11 NL-6971 AN Brummen / NL | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2015/09] | Application number, filing date | 13720107.5 | 12.04.2013 | [2022/12] | WO2013NL50266 | Priority number, date | NL20122008632 | 12.04.2012 Original published format: NL 2008632 | [2015/09] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013154431 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2839271 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2839271 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/12, G01N33/00, A61B5/08 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
A61B5/082 (EP,US);
A61B5/097 (EP,US);
A61B5/6898 (US);
A61B5/7405 (US);
A61B5/742 (US);
G01N27/12 (EP,US);
G01N33/497 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON ATEMPROBEN | [2015/09] | English: | MOBILE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ANALYSING BREATH SAMPLES | [2015/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ CONÇUS POUR ANALYSER DES ÉCHANTILLONS D'HALEINE | [2015/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 02.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.04.2013 | AL | 23.03.2022 | AT | 23.03.2022 | CY | 23.03.2022 | CZ | 23.03.2022 | DK | 23.03.2022 | EE | 23.03.2022 | ES | 23.03.2022 | FI | 23.03.2022 | HR | 23.03.2022 | IT | 23.03.2022 | LT | 23.03.2022 | LV | 23.03.2022 | MC | 23.03.2022 | MK | 23.03.2022 | MT | 23.03.2022 | PL | 23.03.2022 | RO | 23.03.2022 | RS | 23.03.2022 | SE | 23.03.2022 | SI | 23.03.2022 | SK | 23.03.2022 | SM | 23.03.2022 | IE | 12.04.2022 | LU | 12.04.2022 | BG | 23.06.2022 | NO | 23.06.2022 | GR | 24.06.2022 | IS | 23.07.2022 | PT | 25.07.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 12.04.2013 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
MK | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 12.04.2022 | ||
LU | 12.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 12.04.2013 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 12.04.2022 | ||
LU | 12.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 12.04.2013 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 12.04.2022 | ||
LU | 12.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 12.04.2022 | ||
LU | 12.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 12.04.2022 | ||
LU | 12.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 12.04.2022 | ||
LU | 12.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
LU | 12.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.03.2022 | |
NO | 23.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2003109794 (PHILLIPS MICHAEL [US]) [X] 25 * paragraph [0029]; figure 1 * [Y] 1-23; | [XDA]WO03064994 (TALTON JAMES D [US]) [XD] 25 * page 10, paragraphs 2,3; figures 1A,1C * [A] 1-23; | [XDA]WO2007061294 (CONSULTATIE IMPLEMENTATIE TECH [NL], et al) [XD] 24 * the whole document *[A] 1-23; | [XY] - PO-CHIANG CHEN ET AL, "Chemical Sensors and Electronic Noses Based on 1-D Metal Oxide Nanostructures", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NANOTECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20081101), vol. 7, no. 6, doi:10.1109/TNANO.2008.2006273, ISSN 1536-125X, pages 668 - 682, XP011335031 [X] 24 * Chapters I, IV, V * [Y] 1-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNANO.2008.2006273 | [XA] - KIM ET AL, "Microheater-integrated single gas sensor array chip fabricated on flexible polyimide substrate", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B: CHEMICAL: INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL DEVOTED TO RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF PHYSICAL AND CHEMICAL TRANSDUCERS, ELSEVIER S.A, SWITZERLAND, vol. 114, no. 1, ISSN 0925-4005, (20060330), pages 410 - 417, (20060330), XP027971429 [X] 24 * Chapter 1 * [A] 1-23 | by applicant | WO03064994 | WO2007061294 |