EP2838808 - DRINK CAN LID COMPRISING AN ARTICULATED NECK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Son, Paul 6, rue Victor Libert 6900 Marche-en-Famenne / BE | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Colens, Alain M.G.M. Office Hanssens SPRL Rue Franz Merjay 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | Colens, Alain M.G.M. Office Hanssens sprl Square Marie Louise 40 Bte 19 1000 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2015/09] | Colens, Alain M.G.M. C/o Office Hanssens SPRL Square Marie Louise 40 Bte 19 1000 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 13720832.8 | 16.04.2013 | [2016/25] | WO2013EP57941 | Priority number, date | BE20120000252 | 16.04.2012 Original published format: BE 201200252 | [2015/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013156495 | Date: | 24.10.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2838808 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2838808 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D25/46 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
B65D25/465 (EP,US);
B65D47/066 (US);
B65D41/005 (US);
B65D51/16 (US);
B65D2205/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRÄNKEDOSENDECKEL MIT EINEM KLAPPBAREN TRINKSTUTZEN | [2015/09] | English: | DRINK CAN LID COMPRISING AN ARTICULATED NECK | [2015/09] | French: | COUVERCLE DE CANETTE DE BOISSON AVEC GOULOT ARTICULE | [2015/09] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 27.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.06.2016 | BG | 22.06.2016 | CY | 22.06.2016 | DK | 22.06.2016 | EE | 22.06.2016 | FI | 22.06.2016 | HR | 22.06.2016 | LT | 22.06.2016 | LV | 22.06.2016 | MC | 22.06.2016 | MK | 22.06.2016 | MT | 22.06.2016 | RO | 22.06.2016 | RS | 22.06.2016 | SE | 22.06.2016 | SI | 22.06.2016 | SK | 22.06.2016 | SM | 22.06.2016 | TR | 22.06.2016 | NO | 22.09.2016 | GR | 23.09.2016 | IS | 22.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.06.2016 | |
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
MT | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 22.06.2016 | |
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MT | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 22.06.2016 | |
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MT | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 22.06.2016 | |
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MT | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MT | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | EE | 22.06.2016 | |
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | EE | 22.06.2016 | |
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 22.06.2016 | |
NO | 22.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3023751 (MEINS WOLFGANG DR ING) [A] 1,14* page 10, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figures 6, 7 *; | [AD]EP1456093 (SON PAUL [BE]) [AD] 1,14 * figures 5, 6; claim 1 * | by applicant | US4407425 | WO0059795 | EP1456093 | EP1456093 |