EP2836317 - SIDE GUIDE FOR A ROLLING TRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primetals Technologies Germany GmbH Schuhstrasse 60 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2015/29] |
Former [2015/08] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRÜSS, Ansgar Postfach 1723 91007 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
KURZ, Matthias Geschwister-Vömel-Weg 46 91052 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Birger Am Rosenhof 29 09618 Brand-Erbisdorf / DE | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Metals@Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 13720845.0 | 24.04.2013 | WO2013EP58494 | Priority number, date | EP20120168684 | 21.05.2012 Original published format: EP 12168684 | [2015/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013174602 | Date: | 28.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2836317 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B21B39/16, B21B3/00 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
B21B39/165 (EP,US);
B21B41/00 (US);
B21B1/28 (US);
B21B31/02 (US);
B21B39/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Title | German: | SEITENFÜHRUNG FÜR EINE WALZSTRASSE | [2015/08] | English: | SIDE GUIDE FOR A ROLLING TRAIN | [2015/08] | French: | GUIDAGE LATÉRAL POUR UN TRAIN DE LAMINOIR | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 09.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/08] | 17.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3116278 (BETR FORSCH INST ANGEW FORSCH [DE]) [X] 1-13 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 4; figures 1-6 *; | [X]JPS59229209 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [X] 1-13* figure 3 * | Examination | JPH03264112 | DE102007035283 | by applicant | DE3116278 | JPS59229209 |