EP2841898 - FORCE SENSOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETH Zurich Raemistrasse 101/ETH Transfer 8092 Zurich / CH | For all designated states Ramot at Tel-Aviv University Ltd. P.O. Box 39296 6139201 Tel-Aviv / IL | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSA, Gabor Emek Charod 34/4 7172300 Modiin-Maccabim-Reut / IL | 02 /
SKÉKELY, Gabor Hedwigstrasse 22 CH-8032 Zürich / CH | 03 /
BAKI, Péter, Sàndor Glattalstrasse 118 F1.2 CH-8052 Zürich / CH | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Strässle, Simon Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Strässle, Simon Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 13721261.9 | 29.04.2013 | WO2013EP01271 | Priority number, date | EP20120002987 | 27.04.2012 Original published format: EP 12002987 | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013159940 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2841898 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/16 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
B25J13/085 (EP,US);
G01L25/00 (US);
G01L5/162 (EP,US);
G01L5/167 (US);
G01L5/226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | KRAFTSENSORVORRICHTUNG | [2015/10] | English: | FORCE SENSOR DEVICE | [2015/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF CAPTEUR DE FORCE | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 19.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 12.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE10217018 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 1,19,23 * figure 2 * [I] 2,20; | [XI] - LORENZ R D ET AL, "A NOVEL, COMPLIANT, FOUR DEGREE-OF-FREEDOM, ROBOTIC FINGERTIP SENSOR", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS SOCIETY ANNUAL MEETING (IAS). PITTSBURGH, OCT. 2 - 7, 1988; [CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS SOCIETY ANNUAL MEETING (IAS)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19881002), vol. CONF. 23, pages 1414 - 1419, XP000012089 [X] 1,19,23 * figure 1 * [I] 2,20 | by applicant | - A. KRUPA; G. MOREL; M. DE MATHELIN, "Achieving high precision laparoscopic manipulation through adaptive force control", ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, 2002. PROCEEDINGS. ICRA '02. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (2002), vol. 2, pages 1864 - 1869 | - R. HOEVER; M. D. LUCA; M. HARDERS, "User-based evaluation of data-driven haptic rendering", ACM TRANS. APPL. PERCEPT., (2010), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1145/1857893.1857900, pages 1 - 23, XP058083825 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1857893.1857900 | - S. YU; S. N. FRY; D. P. POTASEK; D. J. BELL; B. J. NELSON, "Characterizing fruit fly flight behavior using a microforce sensor with a new comb-drive configuration", MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, JOURNAL OF, (2005), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1109/JMEMS.2004.839028, pages 4 - 11, XP011126422 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JMEMS.2004.839028 | - P. PUANGMALI; K. ALTHOEFER; L. D. SENEVIRATNE; D. MURPHY; P. DASGUPTA, "State-of- the-Art in Force and Tactile Sensing for Minimally Invasive Surgery", SENSORS JOURNAL, IEEE, (2008), vol. 8, pages 371 - 381, XP011204346 | - P. VALDASTRI; K. HARADA; A. MENCIASSI; L. BECCAI; C. STEFANINI; M. FUJIE; P. DARIO, "Integration of a Miniaturised Triaxial Force Sensor in a Minimally Invasive Surgical Tool", BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON, (2006), vol. 53, doi:doi:10.1109/TBME.2006.883618, pages 2397 - 2400, XP011149504 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBME.2006.883618 | - A. UNERI; M. A. BALICKI; J. HANDA; P. GEHLBACH; R. H. TAYLOR; I. LORDACHITA, "New steady-hand Eye Robot with micro-force sensing for vitreoretinal surgery", BIOMEDICAL ROBOTICS AND BIOMECHATRONICS (BIOROB), 2010 3RD IEEE RAS AND EMBS INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (2010), pages 814 - 819, XP031793378 | - P. VALDASTRI; S. ROCCELLA; L. BECCAI; E. CATTIN; A. MENCIASSI; M. C. CARROZZA; P. DARIO, "Characterization of a novel hybrid silicon three axial force sensor", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A: PHYSICAL, (2005), vol. 123, no. 124, doi:doi:10.1016/j.sna.2005.01.006, pages 249 - 257, XP005073468 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sna.2005.01.006 | - D. BENFIELD; E. LOU; W. A. MOUSSA, "Parametric evaluation of shear sensitivity in piezoresistive interfacial force sensors", JOURNAL OF MICROMECHANICS AND MICROENGINEERING, (2011), vol. 21, page 045005 | - V. A. HO; D. V. DAO; S. SUGIYAMA; S. HIRAI, "Design of a small-scale tactile sensor with three sensing points for using in robotic fingertips", ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA), 2010 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (2010), pages 4855 - 4860 | - Y. HU; R. B. KATRAGADDA; H. TU; Q. ZHENG; Y. LI; Y. XU, "Bioinspired 3-D Tactile Sensor for Minimally Invasive Surgery", MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, JOURNAL OF, (2010), vol. 19, doi:doi:10.1109/JMEMS.2010.2076778, pages 1400 - 1408, XP011336993 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JMEMS.2010.2076778 | - K. KRISTIANSEN; P. MCGUIGGAN; G. CARVER; C. MEINHART; J. ISRAELACHVILI, "3D force and displacement sensor for SFA and AFM measurements", LANGMUIR, (200802), vol. 24, doi:doi:10.1021/la702380h, pages 1541 - 1549, XP055075097 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la702380h | - J. H. SHAN; T. M. MEI; L. SUN; D. Y. KONG; Z. Y. ZHANG; L. NI.; M. MENG; J. R. CHU, "The design and fabrication of a flexible three-dimensional force sensor skin", INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS, 2005. (IROS 2005). 2005 IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (2005), vol. 18, pages 18 - 1823 | - G. THOLEY; J. P. DESAI, "A Modular, Automated Laparoscopic Grasper with Three-Dimensional Force Measurement Capability", ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, 2007 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (2007), pages 250 - 255 | - G. VÁSÁRHELYI; M. ADAM; E. VAZSONYI; I. BÁRSONY; C. DÜCSÖ, "Effects of the elastic cover on tactile sensor arrays", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A: PHYSICAL, (2006), vol. 132, doi:doi:10.1016/j.sna.2006.01.009, pages 245 - 251, XP025081940 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sna.2006.01.009 | - W. WANG; Y. ZHAO; Q. LIN, "An integrated MEMS tactile tri-axial micro-force probe sensor for Minimally Invasive Surgery", NANO/MOLECULAR MEDICINE AND ENGINEERING (NANOMED), 2009 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (2009), vol. 7, pages 1 - 76 | - C.-C. WEN; W. FANG, "Tuning the sensing range and sensitivity of three axes tactile sensors using the polymer composite membrane", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A: PHYSICAL, (2008), vol. 145, no. 146, doi:doi:10.1016/j.sna.2007.10.011, pages 14 - 22, XP022716410 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sna.2007.10.011 | - M. OHKA; Y. MITSUYA; I. HIGASHIOKA; H. KABESHITA, "An experimental optical three-axis tactile sensor for micro-robots", ROBOTICA, (200507), vol. 23, pages 457 - 465 | - J. PEIRS; J. CLIJNEN; D. REYNAERTS; H. V. BRUSSEL; P. HERIJGERS; B. CORTEVILLE; S. BOONE, "A micro optical force sensor for force feedback during minimally invasive robotic surgery", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A: PHYSICAL, (2004), vol. 115, doi:doi:10.1016/j.sna.2004.04.057, pages 447 - 455, XP004562104 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sna.2004.04.057 | - P. POLYGERINOS; P. PUANGMALI; T. SCHAEFFTER; R. RAZAVI; L. D. SENEVIRATNE; K. ALTHOEFER, "Novel miniature MRI-compatible fiberoptic force sensor for cardiac catheterization procedures", ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA), 2010 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (2010), pages 2598 - 2603 | - P. PUANGMALI; H. LIU; L. D. SENEVIRATNE; P. DASGUPTA; K. ALTHOEFER, "Miniature 3-Axis Distal Force Sensor for Minimally Invasive Surgical Palpation", MECHATRONICS, IEEE/ASME TRANSACTIONS ON, (2011), pages 1 - 11 | - U. X. TAN; Y. BO; R. GULLAPALLI; J. P. DESAI, "Triaxial MRI-Compatible Fiberoptic Force Sensor", ROBOTICS, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON, (2011), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1109/TRO.2010.2090061, pages 65 - 74, XP011333018 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TRO.2010.2090061 | - T. TOKUNO; M. TADA; K. UMEDA, "High-precision MRI-compatible force sensor with parallel plate structure", BIOMEDICAL ROBOTICS AND BIOMECHATRONICS, 2008. BIOROB 2008. 2ND IEEE RAS & EMBS INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (2008), pages 33 - 38, XP031413309 | - F. BEYELER; S. MUNTWYLER; B. J. NELSON, "A Six-Axis MEMS Force-Torque Sensor With Micro-Newton and Nano-Newtonmeter Resolution", MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, JOURNAL OF, (2009), vol. 18, pages 433 - 441, XP011251080 | - H.-K. LEE; J. CHUNG; S.-I. CHANG; E. YOON, "Normal and Shear Force Measurement Using a Flexible Polymer Tactile Sensor With Embedded Multiple Capacitors", MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, JOURNAL OF, (2008), vol. 17, doi:doi:10.1109/JMEMS.2008.921727, pages 934 - 942, XP011229540 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JMEMS.2008.921727 | - U. SEIBOLD; B. KUBLER; G. HIRZINGER, "Prototype of Instrument for Minimally Invasive Surgery with 6-Axis Force Sensing Capability", ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, 2005. ICRA 2005. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2005 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (2005), doi:doi:10.1109/ROBOT.2005.1570167, pages 496 - 501, XP010872161 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.2005.1570167 | - P. PUANGMALI; P. DASGUPTA; L. D. SENEVIRATNE; K. ALTHOEFER, "Miniaturized triaxial optical fiber force sensor for MRI-Guided minimally invasive surgery", ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA), 2010 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (2010), pages 2592 - 2597 | - "CMOS-integrated silicon 3D force sensor system for micro component coordinate measurement machines", B. LEVEY; P. GIESCHKE; M. DOELLE; S. SPINNER; A. TRAUTMANN; P. RUTHER; O. PAUL, Proceedings of the Ieee Twentieth Annual International Conference on Micro Electro Mechanical Systems, (2007), pages 486 - 489 |