EP2846762 - COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Croda International PLC Cowick Hall Snaith Goole, East Yorkshire DN14 9AA / GB | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAVAN, Bhaven 10 Coppicewood Grove Bradford Yorkshire BD7 2JB / GB | 02 /
BARNES, Alun 7 Lime Tree Drive Whitley Goole Yorkshire DN14 0GF / GB | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Karfopoulos, Alexis Theo Croda Europe Limited IP Department Cowick Hall Snaith Goole, Yorkshire DN14 9AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Karfopoulos, Alexis Theo Croda Europe Limited IP Department Cowick Hall Snaith, Goole, Yorkshire DN14 9AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13721374.0 | 22.04.2013 | WO2013GB51005 | Priority number, date | GB20120008133 | 10.05.2012 Original published format: GB 201208133 | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013167866 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2846762 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/31, A61K8/34, A61Q19/00, A61K8/55 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
A61K8/31 (EP);
A61K8/342 (EP);
A61K8/55 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/12] | A61K8/31, A61K8/34, A61Q19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2015/12] | English: | COMPOSITION | [2015/12] | French: | COMPOSITION | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 21.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 30.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.01.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2139112 (KAO CORP) [X] 1-15 * examples 5, 7,15; table 3 *; | [X]CH678488 (GIVENCHY PARFUMS) [X] 1-15 * claim 4 *; | [X]US2006051486 (DOWDELL DAVID P [AU], et al) [X] 1-15 * example 10 *; | [X]US2007048241 (OBUKOWHO PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 63] *; | [X]US2008193405 (MUKHERJEE PILAKESH [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * examples 7, 53, 58, 67 *; | [X] - "Cold Cream for Hands", GNPD, MINTEL, (200503), Database accession no. 344071, XP002732129 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - "Hand Lotion", GNPD, MINTEL, (201201), Database accession no. 1715332, XP002732127 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - "Cold Cream", GNPD, MINTEL, (201010), Database accession no. 1414250, XP002732128 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [T] - Anonymous, "Phosphate Esters", (20090624), Croda, URL: http://www.croda.com/download.aspx?s=1&m=doc&id=b1d62e14-1d16-43f9-9951-4af7e44ca372, (20141106), XP002732130 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | - M. TSANG; R.H GUY, BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, (2010), vol. 163 |