EP2813103 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR CORRECTING ERROR EVENTS ASSOCIATED WITH IDENTITY PROVISIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.2020 [2020/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Li 1 Infinite Loop M/S 302-11OS Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
SCHELL, Stephan, V. 1 Infinite Loop M/S 35-2MP Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Black, Diego Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/51] | Gillard, Matthew Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13722157.8 | 08.02.2013 | WO2013US25397 | Priority number, date | US201261597359P | 10.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261597359 P | [2014/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013119993 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2813103 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/12, H04W12/10, H04W48/06, H04W52/02, H04L29/14, // H04W12/04, H04W8/20, H04W28/02, H04W8/26, H04W28/06, H04W74/00 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
H04W48/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/40 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/0289 (US);
H04W12/125 (EP,US);
H04W28/0273 (KR);
H04W28/04 (KR);
H04W52/0212 (EP,KR,US);
H04W8/20 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/51] | H04W28/02, H04W12/12, H04W8/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KORREKTUR VON FEHLEREREIGNISSEN IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT IDENTITÄTSBEREITSTELLUNG | [2014/51] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR CORRECTING ERROR EVENTS ASSOCIATED WITH IDENTITY PROVISIONING | [2014/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR CORRIGER DES ÉVÉNEMENTS D'ERREUR ASSOCIÉS À L'APPROVISIONNEMENT DE MODULES D'AUTHENTIFICATION D'IDENTITÉ D'ABONNÉ | [2014/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 22.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/05] | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6789203 (BELISSENT JACQUES E [US]) [A] 1-32* page 5, line 36 - page 6, line 40 *; | [Y]US2006256760 (PATRICK CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [Y] 7-20,28-32 * paragraphs [0013] , [0029] - [0047] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2009103622 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-32 * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 5 * * sentences 23-28, paragraph 11 * * page 18, lines 2-3 *; | [A]WO2011057668 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-32 * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 24 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2011136482 (KALINER STEFAN [DE]) [A] 1-32 * paragraphs [0047] - [0054] *; | [IY]US2011265158 (CHA INHYOK [US], et al) [I] 1-6,21-27 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] - [0020] , [0025] , [0030] , [0031] * * paragraphs [0035] , [0044] , [0053] - [0056] - [0060] - [0062] - [0065] - [0068] - [0075] , [0083] * * paragraphs [0147] , [0152] * * figures 7-9 * [Y] 7-20,28-32 |