EP2849971 - CYLINDRICAL BRAID CRIMP CONNECTION STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8333 / JP | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAHASHI, Mitsuharu c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd. 1500, Mishuku Susono-shi, Shizuoka 410-1194 / JP | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/31] |
Former [2015/13] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13723260.9 | 19.04.2013 | [2018/31] | WO2013JP62313 | Priority number, date | JP20120110180 | 14.05.2012 Original published format: JP 2012110180 | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013172178 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2849971 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2849971 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02, H05K9/00, H01R4/20, H01R9/03, // H01R103/00 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
H01R4/203 (EP,CN,US);
H01R9/03 (US);
H05K9/0018 (EP,CN,US);
H01R13/65912 (EP,CN,US);
H01R2103/00 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | B60R16/02, H05K9/00, H01R4/20, H01R9/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRUKTUR ZUR KRIMPVERBINDUNG EINES UMFLOCHTENEN LEITERS | [2018/15] | English: | CYLINDRICAL BRAID CRIMP CONNECTION STRUCTURE | [2015/13] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CONNEXION PAR SERTISSAGE POUR UNE TRESSE CYLINDRIQUE | [2018/15] |
Former [2015/13] | ZYLINDRISCHE GEFLECHT-CRIMPVERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR | ||
Former [2015/13] | STRUCTURE DE CONNEXION DE SERTISSURE TRESSÉE CYLINDRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 02.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2013 | AL | 01.08.2018 | AT | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | CZ | 01.08.2018 | DK | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | ES | 01.08.2018 | FI | 01.08.2018 | HR | 01.08.2018 | IT | 01.08.2018 | LT | 01.08.2018 | LV | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | MK | 01.08.2018 | MT | 01.08.2018 | NL | 01.08.2018 | PL | 01.08.2018 | RO | 01.08.2018 | RS | 01.08.2018 | SE | 01.08.2018 | SI | 01.08.2018 | SK | 01.08.2018 | SM | 01.08.2018 | TR | 01.08.2018 | BG | 01.11.2018 | NO | 01.11.2018 | GR | 02.11.2018 | IS | 01.12.2018 | PT | 01.12.2018 | GB | 19.04.2019 | IE | 19.04.2019 | LU | 19.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | FR | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 19.04.2013 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
MT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.04.2019 | ||
LU | 19.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.04.2013 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.04.2019 | ||
LU | 19.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.04.2019 | ||
LU | 19.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.04.2019 | ||
LU | 19.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.04.2019 | ||
LU | 19.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.04.2019 | ||
LU | 19.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.04.2019 | ||
LU | 19.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
LU | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 01.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2011096425 (YAZAKI CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1,2 * figures 4-6 *; | [IP]EP2533376 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [IP] 1,2 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0067]; figures 4-6 *; | [Y]US2004144557 (MIYAZAKI SHO [JP]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0023] , [0 30]; figure 3 *; | [Y]JP2010140757 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | US2004099428 | by applicant | JP2003264040 |