EP2867508 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND A SYSTEM COMPRISING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND A CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2015/19] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUTSCHER, Andreas Bruckmuehle 7 71706 Markgroeningen / DE | 02 /
POSSELT, Andreas Zwerchstr. 28 75417 Muehlacker / DE | 03 /
LORENZ, Marko Braunersbergsteige 28 71723 Grossbottwar / DE | [2015/19] | Application number, filing date | 13723467.0 | 14.05.2013 | WO2013EP59892 | Priority number, date | DE201210210937 | 27.06.2012 Original published format: DE102012210937 | [2015/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014000946 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2867508 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/24, F02D41/30, F02D19/06 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
F02D41/3094 (EP,KR,US);
F02D41/2432 (EP,KR,US);
F02D19/0692 (EP,KR,US);
F02D41/34 (US);
Y02T10/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE UND SYSTEM MIT EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE UND EINEM STEUERGERÄT | [2015/19] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND A SYSTEM COMPRISING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND A CONTROL DEVICE | [2015/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE ET SYSTÈME COMPRENANT UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE ET UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 07.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/23] | 07.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2163750 (MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN SPA [IT]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE102008044244 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1-8* the whole document *; | [X]DE102009031583 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102010003209 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102008044244 |