EP2868115 - OPTICAL SIGNAL ROUTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Telecommunications Public Limited Company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORD, Andrew PP: C5A 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | 02 /
JENSEN, Richard Andrew PP: C5A 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Chan, Robin, et al BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Chan, Robin, et al British Telecommunications plc Intellectual Property Department PPC5A, BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13723899.4 | 10.05.2013 | WO2013GB00209 | Priority number, date | EP20120250127 | 29.06.2012 Original published format: EP 12250127 | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014001738 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2868115 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00, H04J14/02 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
H04J14/0204 (EP,US);
H04J14/02 (US);
H04J14/0205 (EP,US);
H04J14/0212 (US);
H04J14/0217 (EP,US);
H04J14/0219 (EP,US);
H04J14/026 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0005 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE SIGNALLEITUNG | [2016/32] | English: | OPTICAL SIGNAL ROUTING | [2015/19] | French: | ROUTAGE DE SIGNAUX OPTIQUES | [2015/19] |
Former [2015/19] | ROUTING OPTISCHER SIGNALE | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 22.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/26] | 07.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012020664 (SAKURAI YASUKI [JP], et al); |