EP2994006 - SECURE VALUE TOKENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gaming Partners International Usa Inc. 1700 South Industrial Road Las Vegas, NV 89102 / US | [2016/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORENO, Francisco, Javier 3993 West 18th Street Yuma, AZ 85364 / US | 02 /
GELINOTTE, Emmanuel 7 Route De Bouze F-21420 Savigny / FR | 03 /
GRONAU, Gregory, Scott 712 Proud Eagle Lane Las Vegas, NV 89144 / US | 04 /
CLARK, Kristen 57 Foxworth Court Las Vegas, NV 89183 / US | 05 /
CORRALES, Heriberto, Castaneda 2937s 48th Way Yuma, AZ 85364 / US | 06 /
SATURNINO, Ramon, Roberto Zaragoza 1601 83448 San Luis, Sonora / MX | 07 /
CASTRO, Raul, Martinez Cjon San Antonio 102 Col. Aeropuerto 83479 San Luis R.C., Sonora / MX | 08 /
FRIEDMAN, Joseph, Brooks 3089 Quail Crest Avenue Henderson, NV 89052 / US | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/11] | Application number, filing date | 13724123.8 | 09.05.2013 | [2016/11] | WO2013US40333 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014182306 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2994006 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2994006 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A44C21/00 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
A44C21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERE WERTTOKEN | [2016/11] | English: | SECURE VALUE TOKENS | [2016/11] | French: | JETONS DE VALEUR SÉCURISÉS | [2016/11] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 11.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 21.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2013 | AL | 29.03.2017 | CZ | 29.03.2017 | DK | 29.03.2017 | EE | 29.03.2017 | ES | 29.03.2017 | FI | 29.03.2017 | HR | 29.03.2017 | LT | 29.03.2017 | LV | 29.03.2017 | MC | 29.03.2017 | MK | 29.03.2017 | NL | 29.03.2017 | PL | 29.03.2017 | PT | 29.03.2017 | RO | 29.03.2017 | RS | 29.03.2017 | SE | 29.03.2017 | SI | 29.03.2017 | SK | 29.03.2017 | SM | 29.03.2017 | TR | 29.03.2017 | IE | 09.05.2017 | LU | 09.05.2017 | MT | 09.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | FR | 31.05.2017 | BG | 29.06.2017 | NO | 29.06.2017 | GR | 30.06.2017 | IS | 29.07.2017 | DE | 01.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MK | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PT | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
TR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MK | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
TR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MK | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/20] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 29.03.2017 | |
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5673503 (RENDLEMAN THOMAS G [US]) [A] 1,5,6,14,17 * column 3, line 27 - column 6, line 33 *; | [A]US5676376 (VALLEY HAROLD J [US]) [A] 1,12-17* column 5, line 9 - line 66 *; | [A]US2010130288 (SHIGETA YASUSHI [JP]) [A] 1,8,14,17,18 * paragraphs [0035] - [0047] * |