EP2964714 - A THERMAL ADHESIVE TAPE FOR OPERATING THE CLOSURE OF TURNED UP PARTS OR THE COUPLING AMONG MANY LAYERS OF FABRIC AND PROVIDED WITH ONE REMOVABLE PROTECTIVE LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DI PANCRAZIO, Tamara Via Petrolini 11 64014 Martinsicuro (TE) / IT | For all designated states CATALDO, Matteo Via Petrolini 11 64014 Martinsicuro (TE) / IT | For all designated states CATALDO, Michela Via Petrolini 11 64014 Martinsicuro (TE) / IT | [2016/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DI PANCRAZIO, Tamara Via Petrolini 11 64014 Martinsicuro (TE) / IT | 02 /
CATALDO, Matteo Via Petrolini 11 64014 Martinsicuro (TE) / IT | 03 /
CATALDO, Michela Via Petrolini 11 64014 Martinsicuro (TE) / IT | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | Emmi, Mario Studio Brevetti Turini Srl Viale Matteotti, 25 50121 Firenze (FI) / IT | [2016/02] | Application number, filing date | 13724416.6 | 04.03.2013 | [2016/02] | WO2013IT00065 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014136129 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2964714 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02, C09J7/04 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
C09J7/21 (EP);
C09J7/35 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] | Extension states | BA | 30.09.2015 | ME | 30.09.2015 | Title | German: | WÄRMEKLEBEBAND ZUM BETREIBEN DES VERSCHLUSSES VON AUFGEBUNDEN TEILEN ODER ZUR KOPPLUNG MEHRERER FASERSCHICHTEN MIT EINER ENTFERNBAREN SCHUTZSCHICHT | [2016/02] | English: | A THERMAL ADHESIVE TAPE FOR OPERATING THE CLOSURE OF TURNED UP PARTS OR THE COUPLING AMONG MANY LAYERS OF FABRIC AND PROVIDED WITH ONE REMOVABLE PROTECTIVE LAYER | [2016/02] | French: | RUBAN ADHÉSIF À CHAUD PERMETTANT DE FERMER DES PARTIES DE REVERS OU PERMETTANT L'ACCOUPLEMENT PARMI PLUSIEURS COUCHES DE TISSU ET POURVU D'UNE COUCHE PROTECTRICE AMOVIBLE | [2016/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 23.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4525233 (BROOKS RONALD H [AU]) [X] 1,10-12 * figure 1; claims 1-6 *; | [A]US2003087090 (CARBONARE MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-18* figures 1,2; claims 1-8 *; | [X]US2004138372 (USCHOLD RONALD EARL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10-18 * paragraphs [0031] , [0033] , [0063]; example 3; claims 1,8,13-17 * | by applicant | IT1998MI00685 |