EP2830515 - NESTED CANNULA TIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TROVATO, Karen Irene c/o High Tech Campus, Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
ENDHOVEN, Willem Albert c/o High Tech Campus, Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Coops, Peter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Coops, Peter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 13724876.1 | 28.03.2013 | WO2013IB52498 | Priority number, date | US201261617853P | 30.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261617853 P | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013144901 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2830515 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61B17/00 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
A61B17/3421 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00331 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00991 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3443 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3454 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3488 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Title | German: | GESCHACHTELTE KANÜLENSPITZEN | [2015/06] | English: | NESTED CANNULA TIPS | [2015/06] | French: | POINTES DE CANULE EMBOÎTÉE | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 21.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002087166 (BROCK DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,13-16 * paragraph [0174]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2003199916 (YEE CARL E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,13-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] - [0053] *; | [X]WO2007059233 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [X] 1-4,13-16 * abstract *; | [XI]WO2007125488 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [X] 1-7,13-19 * abstract * * page 8, line 18 - page 11, line 8 * [I] 8-12,20-24; | [X]US2009062832 (GRIFFITH NATHAN CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [X] 1-6,13-18* paragraphs [0033] - [0035]; figures 1,3,5 *; | [X]WO2010044051 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,13-16 * abstract *; | [X]WO2010073135 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,13-16 * abstract * |