EP2849658 - DISPOSABLE BLADE ASSEMBLY AND REUSABLE BLADE HUB ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/13] | REUSABLE BLADE HUB ASSEMBLY | ||
[2020/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith & Nephew, Inc 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | [2021/01] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Smith&Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORETH, Brian Joseph 70 Hill View Road Braintree, Massachusetts 02184 / US | 02 /
IRMAKOGLU-SHENER, Cemal 37 Sylvanus Wood Lane Woburn, Massachusetts 01801 / US | 03 /
JEZIERSKI, Rafael Z. 143 Boston Street Middleton, Massachusetts 01949 / US | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/27] |
Former [2015/13] | Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO10 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 13724971.0 | 07.05.2013 | [2021/27] | WO2013US39796 | Priority number, date | US201213472895 | 16.05.2012 Original published format: US201213472895 | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013173114 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2849658 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2849658 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
A61B17/32002 (EP,CN,US);
A61B90/08 (US);
A61B2017/0023 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/0813 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] |
Former [2015/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEGWERFBARE KLINGENANORDNUNG UND WIEDERVERWENDBARE KLINGEN-NABEN-ANORDNUNG | [2020/48] | English: | DISPOSABLE BLADE ASSEMBLY AND REUSABLE BLADE HUB ASSEMBLY | [2020/48] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE LAME JETABLE ET ENSEMBLE MOYEU DE LAME RÉUTILISABLE | [2020/48] |
Former [2015/13] | WIEDERVERWENDBARE SCHAUFEL-NABEN-ANORDNUNG | ||
Former [2015/13] | REUSABLE BLADE HUB ASSEMBLY | ||
Former [2015/13] | ENSEMBLE MOYEU DE LAME RÉUTILISABLE | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 11.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2019 | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2013 | AL | 07.07.2021 | AT | 07.07.2021 | CY | 07.07.2021 | CZ | 07.07.2021 | DK | 07.07.2021 | EE | 07.07.2021 | ES | 07.07.2021 | FI | 07.07.2021 | HR | 07.07.2021 | IT | 07.07.2021 | LT | 07.07.2021 | LV | 07.07.2021 | MC | 07.07.2021 | MK | 07.07.2021 | MT | 07.07.2021 | NL | 07.07.2021 | PL | 07.07.2021 | RO | 07.07.2021 | RS | 07.07.2021 | SE | 07.07.2021 | SI | 07.07.2021 | SK | 07.07.2021 | SM | 07.07.2021 | TR | 07.07.2021 | BG | 07.10.2021 | NO | 07.10.2021 | GR | 08.10.2021 | IS | 07.11.2021 | PT | 08.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 07.05.2013 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
MK | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
TR | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 07.05.2013 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
MK | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 07.05.2013 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 07.05.2013 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5019035 (MISSIRLIAN BERGE [US], et al) [X] 1,13,16,19 * figures 2, 5 * [I] 2,3; | [XI]US5376078 (DINGER III FRED B [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,13,14,19-21 * column 3, lines 16-39 * * column 4, lines 21-27 * * column 5, lines 22-36 * * figures 1-5 * [I] 7-12,15; | [XI]US5766200 (MAZUREK WILLIAM F [US], et al) [X] 13,14,17,18 * column 5, lines 24-41 * * column 12, lines 41-65 * * figures 7A, 7B * [I] 15; | [A]US2003163134 (RIEDEL DANNY C [US], et al) [A] 1-3* figures 17A, 17B *; | [XI]US2006025792 (GIBSON ROGER A [US], et al) [X] 1,5,13,19-21 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027] - [0 31] , [0 33] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 6-12,14-18; | [X]WO2009023607 (TARGET MEDICAL INNOVATIONS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,13,19-21 * page 22, line 29 - page 24, line 10 * * figures 13, 14 *; | [XI]US2012109130 (CASEY JAY A [US], et al) [X] 13,19,21 * paragraphs [0018] , [0 26] , [0 28] , [0 45] , [0 61] * * figures 2-5C * [I] 1-4,20 | by applicant | US5133729 | US6090122 |