EP2856059 - HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING A REINFORCED COLLECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systemes Thermiques Service Propriété Industrielle 8 rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis / FR | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAY, Alan 7 impasse des Carmélites F-51100 Reims / FR | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Metz, Gaëlle Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 8, rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Metz, Gaëlle Valeo Systèmes Thermiques S.A.S. Propriété Industrielle 8, rue Louis Lormand BP 517 - La Verrière 78321 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 13725116.1 | 16.05.2013 | [2016/24] | WO2013EP60180 | Priority number, date | FR20120054743 | 24.05.2012 Original published format: FR 1254743 | [2015/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013174719 | Date: | 28.11.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2856059 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2856059 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
F28F9/0226 (EP,US);
F28F9/02 (KR);
F28F3/025 (US);
B21D39/02 (KR);
B21D39/03 (KR);
F28D1/053 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT VERSTÄRKTEM KOLLEKTOR | [2015/15] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING A REINFORCED COLLECTOR | [2015/15] | French: | ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR A COLLECTEUR RENFORCE | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 28.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2013 | AL | 15.06.2016 | AT | 15.06.2016 | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | DK | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | FI | 15.06.2016 | HR | 15.06.2016 | IT | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | MK | 15.06.2016 | MT | 15.06.2016 | NL | 15.06.2016 | RO | 15.06.2016 | RS | 15.06.2016 | SE | 15.06.2016 | SI | 15.06.2016 | SK | 15.06.2016 | SM | 15.06.2016 | NO | 15.09.2016 | GR | 16.09.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | PT | 17.10.2016 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/48] | HU | 16.05.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 16.05.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.05.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 15.06.2016 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | EE | 15.06.2016 | |
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | EE | 15.06.2016 | |
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | |
NO | 15.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2254771 (CHAUSSON USINES SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,8,12 * figure 5 *; | [X]JPH03225197 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP) [X] 1-3,8,12 * figure 3 *; | [XI]JP2004125333 (TOYO RADIATOR CO LTD) [X] 1-3,8,12 * abstract * [I] 4-7,9-11,13-15; | [A]WO2011073038 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102011013043 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,12 * figure 6 *; | [A]US2012018135 (CIAFFARAFA MARIO [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0052] * | by applicant | FR2742531 |