EP2856086 - METHOD FOR MEASURING FILL-LEVEL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TRAVEL TIME PRINCIPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/15] | METHOD FOR MEASURING FILL-LEVEL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DELAY PRINCIPLE | ||
[2019/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress+Hauser SE+Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2018/15] |
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. KG. Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORENFLO, Stefan Teichstrasse 6 79688 Hausen / DE | 02 /
MALINOVSKIY, Alexey Webereistr. 40 79689 Maulburg / DE | 03 /
PANKRATZ, Klaus Wässerleweg 6 79400 Kandern / DE | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Koslowski, Christine Adelheid Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/32] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2015/15] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 13725129.4 | 21.05.2013 | [2022/32] | WO2013EP60417 | Priority number, date | DE201210104858 | 05.06.2012 Original published format: DE102012104858 | [2015/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013182418 | Date: | 12.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2856086 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2856086 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/284, G01F23/2962, G01F23/80 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
G01F23/284 (EP,US);
G01F23/2962 (EP,US);
G01F23/80 (EP,US);
G01F23/802 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/15] | G01F23/284, G01F23/296 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FÜLLSTANDSMESSUNG NACH DEM LAUFZEITPRINZIP | [2015/15] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING FILL-LEVEL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TRAVEL TIME PRINCIPLE | [2019/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE NIVEAU DE REMPLISSAGE D'APRÈS LE PRINCIPE DU TEMPS DE VOL | [2015/15] |
Former [2015/15] | METHOD FOR MEASURING FILL-LEVEL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DELAY PRINCIPLE | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 13.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2019 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 10.08.2022 | CZ | 10.08.2022 | DK | 10.08.2022 | EE | 10.08.2022 | ES | 10.08.2022 | FI | 10.08.2022 | HR | 10.08.2022 | LT | 10.08.2022 | LV | 10.08.2022 | MC | 10.08.2022 | NL | 10.08.2022 | PL | 10.08.2022 | RO | 10.08.2022 | RS | 10.08.2022 | SI | 10.08.2022 | SK | 10.08.2022 | SM | 10.08.2022 | NO | 10.11.2022 | GR | 11.11.2022 | IS | 10.12.2022 | PT | 12.12.2022 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 10.08.2022 | |
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 10.08.2022 | |
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 10.08.2022 | |
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5587969 (KROEMER NILS [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 4, line 3 - column 6, line 33 *; | [A]GB2338132 (FEDERAL IND IND GROUP INC [CA]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [XYI]US6345683 (GORDON R LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 53 * * column 5, line 21 - column 8, line 50 * [Y] 5 [I] 4,8,12,13; | [XI]DE10105652 (GRIESHABER VEGA KG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraph 7 - paragraph 10 * * page 4, paragraph 30 - paragraph 41 * [I] 2-13; | [A]EP1918735 (SIEMENS MILLTRONICS PROC INSTR [CA]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] *; | [A]EP1936403 (PEPPERL & FUCHS [DE]) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [YA]US2010162811 (MALINOVSKIY ALEXEY [DE], et al) [Y] 5 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033] * [A] 1-4,6-13 | by applicant | DE10260962 | DE102004052110 |