EP2854533 - ACTIVE COMPOUNDS COMBINATIONS COMPRISING A LIPO-CHITOOLIGOSACCHARIDE DERIVATIVE AND CLOTHIANIDIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/15] | ACTIVE COMPOUNDS COMBINATIONS COMPRISING A LIPO-CHITOOLIGOSACCHARIDE DERIVATIVE AND A NEMATICIDE, INSECTICIDAL OR FUNGICIDAL COMPOUND | ||
[2018/07] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENTING, Jürgen Amselstrasse 7 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 02 /
MEISSNER, Ruth Kuhlmannweg 35 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
VORS, Jean-Pierre 6 allée Adanson 69110 F-69110 Sainte-Foy-Les-Lyon / FR | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 13725132.8 | 22.05.2013 | WO2013EP60452 | Priority number, date | EP20120356013 | 22.05.2012 Original published format: EP 12356013 | US201261669691P | 10.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261669691 P | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013174836 | Date: | 28.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2854533 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/00, A01N51/00, A01N63/02, A01N63/00, C07H5/06 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
A01N43/16 (EP,US);
A01N25/00 (US);
A01N43/78 (US);
A01N51/00 (US);
A01N63/20 (EP,US);
A01N63/22 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N43/16, A01N37/46, A01N43/12, A01N43/40, A01N43/54, A01N43/56, A01N43/653, A01N43/78, A01N43/90, A01N47/02, A01N47/24, A01N47/24, A01N47/34, A01N51/00, A01N63/20, A01N63/22, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N63/20, A01N51/00, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N63/22, A01N51/00, A01N2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/15] | A01N43/16, A01P21/00, A01N51/00, A01N63/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Title | German: | AKTIVE VERBINDUNGSKOMBINATIONEN MIT EINEM LIPO-CHITO-OLIGOSACCHARIDDERIVAT UND CLOTHIANIDIN | [2018/07] | English: | ACTIVE COMPOUNDS COMBINATIONS COMPRISING A LIPO-CHITOOLIGOSACCHARIDE DERIVATIVE AND CLOTHIANIDIN | [2018/07] | French: | COMBINAISONS DE COMPOSÉS ACTIFS COMPRENANT UN DÉRIVÉ DE LIPOCHITOOLIGOSACCHARIDES ET CLOTHIANIDIN | [2018/07] |
Former [2015/15] | WIRKSTOFFKOMBINATIONEN MIT EINEM LIPO-CHITOOLIGOSACCHARIDDERIVAT UND EINER NEMATIZID-, INSEKTIZID- ODER FUNGIZIDVERBINDUNG | ||
Former [2015/15] | ACTIVE COMPOUNDS COMBINATIONS COMPRISING A LIPO-CHITOOLIGOSACCHARIDE DERIVATIVE AND A NEMATICIDE, INSECTICIDAL OR FUNGICIDAL COMPOUND | ||
Former [2015/15] | COMBINAISONS DE COMPOSÉS ACTIFS COMPRENANT UN DÉRIVÉ DE LIPOCHITOOLIGOSACCHARIDE ET UN COMPOSÉ NÉMATICIDE, INSECTICIDE OU FONGICIDE | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 28.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 20.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.03.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2008071674 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE SA [FR], et al) [XD] 1-5,7-16 * claims 47, 48, 51 * * page 42, lines 21-33 * * page 43, line 10 *; | [XD]WO2008071672 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE SA [FR], et al) [XD] 1-5,7-16 * p. 33: first compound * * page 35, lines 14,22,24 * * page 36, line 16 * * claims 48,50 *; | [XD]WO2010125065 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [XD] 1-5,7-16 * pagr 16. last compound * * page 21, lines 16,35 * * page 22, lines 3,11,18,40 * * page 24, line 11 * * page 26, line 37 * * page 27, lines 13,25,30 ** page 29, line 10 * | by applicant | US4245432 | US4272417 | US4761373 | US4808430 | WO8910396 | WO9102069 | US5013659 | US5084082 | WO9205251 | US5141870 | US5198599 | EP0539588 | EP0571427 | US5273894 | US5276268 | WO9404693 | US5304732 | WO9409144 | WO9411520 | US5331107 | WO9421795 | US5378824 | WO9504826 | WO9509910 | US5434283 | EP0663956 | WO9526407 | US5463175 | WO9531553 | WO9535026 | WO9601904 | WO9615248 | WO9619581 | EP0719338 | WO9621023 | EP0728213 | WO9627674 | US5561236 | WO9633270 | WO9634968 | WO9638567 | US5605011 | WO9711188 | US5637489 | WO9720936 | US5646024 | US5648477 | WO9726362 | WO9732985 | WO9741218 | WO9742328 | WO9744472 | WO9745545 | WO9747806 | WO9747807 | WO9747808 | WO9800549 | US5712107 | US5731180 | US5739082 | EP0837944 | WO9820145 | WO9822604 | US5767361 | WO9827212 | US5773702 | WO9827806 | US5776760 | WO9832326 | WO9839460 | WO9840503 | WO9844140 | US5824790 | US5840946 | US5876739 | WO9912950 | WO9924585 | WO9924586 | WO9924593 | US5908810 | US5908975 | WO9934008 | US5928937 | US5965755 | US5969169 | WO9953072 | WO9957965 | WO9958688 | WO9958690 | WO9958654 | WO9966050 | US6013861 | WO0004173 | WO0008184 | WO0008185 | WO0008175 | WO0011192 | WO0014249 | WO0022140 | WO0026345 | WO0026356 | US6063947 | WO0028052 | WO0047727 | WO0066746 | WO0066747 | WO0073422 | WO0077229 | US6169190 | WO0112782 | WO0112826 | WO0114569 | WO0117333 | WO0119975 | WO0124615 | WO0131042 | US6229072 | WO0141558 | WO0151654 | US6270828 | US6284479 | WO0166704 | WO0165922 | US2001029014 | US6323392 | WO0198509 | US2002031826 | WO0226995 | WO0228186 | WO0234923 | WO0234946 | WO0236782 | WO0236787 | WO0236831 | WO0244407 | WO0246387 | WO0245485 | US2002102582 | US2002120964 | WO02079410 | WO02080675 | US6468747 | WO02096882 | WO02101059 | WO02100163 | WO03013226 | WO03013224 | WO03033540 | US2003097687 | WO03052073 | US2003126634 | WO03071860 | US2003176428 | US2003188347 | WO03092360 | WO03106457 | WO2004011601 | WO2004024928 | US6734341 | WO2004040012 | WO2004039986 | WO2004053219 | WO2004053062 | WO2004056999 | US6768044 | WO2004072235 | US2004172669 | WO2004074492 | WO2004078983 | WO2004090140 | WO2004099160 | WO2004099447 | WO2004106529 | US2004250317 | WO2005002324 | WO2005002359 | WO2005012515 | WO2005012529 | US2005039226 | WO2005017157 | WO2005020673 | WO2005030942 | WO2005030941 | WO2005035486 | US2005086719 | WO2005054479 | WO2005054480 | WO2005059103 | WO2005061720 | WO2005063784 | WO2005063094 | WO2005077934 | US2005188434 | WO2005085216 | US2005216969 | WO2005093093 | WO2005095632 | WO2005095617 | WO2005095619 | WO2005095618 | WO2005103266 | WO2005103301 | WO2005123927 | WO2006007373 | WO2006015376 | WO2006018319 | WO2006021972 | WO2006024351 | US2006059581 | US2006059590 | WO2006032538 | US2006070139 | WO2006043635 | WO2006045633 | US2006095986 | WO2006056433 | WO2006060634 | US2006130175 | WO2006063862 | WO2006072603 | US2006162007 | WO2006089633 | WO2006098952 | US7112665 | WO2006100288 | WO2006103107 | US2006230473 | WO2006108702 | WO2006108674 | WO2006108675 | JP2006304779 | WO2006129204 | WO2006128569 | WO2006128570 | WO2006128573 | WO2006128571 | WO2006128572 | WO2006130436 | WO2006128568 | US2006282915 | WO2006133827 | WO2006136351 | WO2007009823 | US2007028322 | WO2007017186 | WO2007024782 | WO2007027777 | US2007067868 | WO2007035650 | WO2007040280 | WO2007039314 | WO2007039315 | WO2007039316 | WO2007057407 | US2007143876 | WO2007075459 | WO2007074405 | WO2007080126 | WO2007080127 | WO2007091277 | WO2007101369 | WO2007103567 | WO2007107302 | WO2007107326 | WO2007115644 | WO2007115643 | WO2007115646 | WO2007140256 | WO2007142840 | US2007292854 | WO2007149134 | WO2008002872 | WO2008009360 | US2008028482 | US2008064032 | US2008070260 | WO2008054747 | WO2008066153 | WO2008067911 | WO2008071672 | WO2008071674 | US2008167456 | US2008196127 | WO2008104503 | WO2008112019 | WO2008114282 | WO2008122406 | US2008260932 | US2008289060 | EP1999141 | EP1999263 | WO2008150473 | US2008312082 | WO2008151780 | US2008320616 | WO2009049851 | US2009130071 | WO2009064652 | US2009137395 | WO2009068313 | WO2009100188 | US2009210970 | WO2009103049 | WO2009102873 | US2009217423 | WO2009111263 | US2009265817 | WO2009144079 | US2009300784 | WO2010005692 | WO2010006713 | WO2010006732 | JP2010018586 | US2010024077 | US2010050282 | WO2010024976 | US2010077501 | US2010080887 | WO2010037016 | WO2010069502 | WO2010074747 | WO2010074751 | WO2010077816 | WO2010076212 | WO2010080829 | US2010184079 | WO2010117737 | WO2010117735 | WO2010125065 | WO2011022469 | US2011067141 | WO2011034704 | WO2011049233 | CN102057925 | WO2011062904 | WO2011066384 | WO2011066360 | US2011138504 | WO2011075593 | WO2011075595 | WO2011084632 | WO2011084621 | - COMAI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1983), vol. 221, pages 370 - 371 | - BARRY ET AL., CURR. TOPICS PLANT PHYSIOL., (1992), vol. 7, pages 139 - 145 | - SHAH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 233, pages 478 - 481 | - GASSER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 263, pages 4280 - 4289 | - TRANEL; WRIGHT, WEED SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 50, pages 700 - 712 | - CRICKMORE ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 62, pages 807 - 813 | - MOELLENBECK ET AL., NAT. BIO- TECHNOL., (2001), vol. 19, pages 668 - 72 | - SCHNEPF ET AL., APPLIED ENVIRONM. MICROBIOL., (2006), vol. 71, pages 1765 - 1774 | - R. WEGLER, Chemie der Pflanzenschutz- and Schad- lingsbekämpfungsmittel, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1970), vol. 2, pages 401 - 412 | - COLBY, S.R., "Calculating Synergistic and Antagonistic Responses of Herbicide Combinations", WEEDS, (1967), vol. 15, pages 20 - 22, XP001112961 | - "Isoboles, a graphic representation of synergism in pesticides", NETH. J. PLANT PATH., (1964), vol. 70, pages 73 - 80 | US20040782020 | US20040783417 | US20040782096 | EP20040077624 | EP20040077984 | US20050315678 | US20060396808 | US20060400598 | EP20060009836 | EP20060090134 | US20060588811 | US20060605824 | EP20060077301 | EP20060090228 | EP20060090227 | US20070651752 | EP20070090007 | US20070657964 | EP20070090009 | US20070681285 | WO2007EP02433 | US20070760570 | US20070760602 | US20070762526 | US20070762886 | US20070763947 | US20070765491 | US20070765494 | US20070769327 | US20070769255 | US20070943801 | US20080020360 | US20080126083 | EP20080075514 | US20080128938 | EP20080010791 | US20080214022 | US20080166253 | US20080668303 | US20080192904 | US20080209354 | US20080195019 | US20080249016 | US20080252453 | US20090352532 | US20090362774 | US20090364335 | US20090364724 | US20090421292 | US20090423926 | US20090468205 | US20090491396 | US20090497221 | US20090288958 |