EP2855082 - DEVICE FOR SHARPENING TOOLS WITH CUTTERS, SUCH AS FOR EXAMPLE DRILLS, MILLING TOOLS OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLLMER WERKE Maschinenfabrik GmbH Ehinger Strasse 34 88400 Biberach/Riss / DE | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARENSTEINER, Ulrich Am Maerzengrund 4 88299 Leutkirch / DE | 02 /
BOTT, Joachim In den Englertswiesen 6 88454 Hochdorf / DE | 03 /
GERST, Manuel Waaghausstrasse 5 88400 Biberach / DE | 04 /
SAEGMUELLER, Manfred Richard Wagner Strasse 8 88444 Ummendorf / DE | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/15] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13725380.3 | 28.05.2013 | [2016/29] | WO2013EP60951 | Priority number, date | DE20121010689 | 30.05.2012 Original published format: DE102012010689 | [2015/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013178625 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2855082 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2855082 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/01, B23Q1/48, B23C1/00, B24B27/00, B24B41/02, B24B3/24, B24B3/02 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
B24B3/24 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B24B3/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B24B27/0061 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23C1/10 (US);
B23C1/12 (US);
B23Q1/015 (EP,CN,US);
B23Q1/017 (EP,CN,US);
B23Q1/44 (US);
B23Q1/4852 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHÄRFEN VON WERKZEUGEN MIT SCHNEIDEN, WIE BEISPIELSWEISE BOHRER, FRÄSER ODER DERGLEICHEN | [2015/15] | English: | DEVICE FOR SHARPENING TOOLS WITH CUTTERS, SUCH AS FOR EXAMPLE DRILLS, MILLING TOOLS OR THE LIKE | [2015/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR AIGUISER DES OUTILS À TAILLANTS COMME, PAR EXEMPLE, DES FORETS, FRAISES OU SIMILAIRE | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 10.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.05.2013 | AL | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | ES | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | HR | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | MK | 20.07.2016 | MT | 20.07.2016 | NL | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | RS | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | SM | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.05.2013 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 28.05.2013 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.05.2013 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 20.07.2016 | |
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | DK | 20.07.2016 | |
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | DK | 20.07.2016 | |
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | DK | 20.07.2016 | |
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10012445 (HALLER HUBERT [DE]) [A] 12,13* abstract *; | [X]WO02066193 (GLEASON WORKS [US]) [X] 1,2,4-12,15,18,19,22 * paragraphs [0001] - [0039] * * figures 1,2,4-7,10-13,15-19 *; | [X]DE10213778 (TRAUB DREHMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-7,10-21 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0109] - [0126] * * figures 1,2,11,12-15 *; | [A]DE10259215 (MFS MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 3,9 * abstract *; | [X]DE102005011306 (TRAUB DREHMASCHINEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10-13,15-19 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0023876 | DE4135823 | DE4242906 | DE19844242 | DE20104030U | CH692450 | CH698920 | US8066548 |