EP2834125 - SEAL FOR A JOINT BEARING FOR A RAIL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2018/44] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/07] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIECKMANN, Maik Braukkamp 8 48249 Dülmen / DE | [2015/07] | Application number, filing date | 13726450.3 | 22.05.2013 | [2019/43] | WO2013EP60440 | Priority number, date | DE201210210873 | 26.06.2012 Original published format: DE102012210873 | [2015/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014000978 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2834125 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2834125 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B61G5/02 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
B61G5/02 (EP);
F16C11/0661 (EP);
F16C11/0666 (EP);
F16C2326/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABDICHTUNG EINES GELENKLAGERS FÜR EIN SCHIENENFAHRZEUG | [2015/07] | English: | SEAL FOR A JOINT BEARING FOR A RAIL VEHICLE | [2015/07] | French: | ÉTANCHÉIFICATION D'UN PALIER À ROTULE POUR UN VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE | [2015/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 03.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2019 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2013 | AL | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | IE | 22.05.2020 | LU | 22.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.05.2013 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
IE | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
IE | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1110200 (INVENTIO AG) [X] 1,2,5-8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2030481 (RHEINSTAHL AG TRANSPORTTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-8,10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2695612 (ALSTHOM GEC [FR]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]US2002150421 (NAKATA SHEIITI [BR], et al) [X] 1-7,10 * the whole document * |