EP2858892 - STRUCTURE FOR AN UNDERWATER VEHICLE SUCH AS A SUBMARINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAVAL GROUP 40-42 rue du Docteur Finlay 75015 Paris / FR | [2017/47] |
Former [2015/16] | For all designated states DCNS 40-42, rue du Docteur Finlay 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUDOLY, Christian Clos Des Minous Impasse Bésostri 83500 La Seyne Sur Mer / FR | 02 /
DAUPLAIS, Xavier 35 Chemin des Pervenches 83200 Toulon / FR | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/16] | 01 /
AUDOLY, Christian Clos Des Minous Impasse Bésostri F-83500 La Seyne Sur Mer / FR | ||
02 /
DAUPLAIS, Xavier 35 Chemin des Pervenches F-83200 Toulon / FR | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/16] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13726566.6 | 05.06.2013 | [2016/32] | WO2013EP61559 | Priority number, date | FR20120055419 | 11.06.2012 Original published format: FR 1255419 | [2015/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013186095 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2858892 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2858892 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B63G8/34, B63G8/39 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
B63G8/34 (EP);
B63G8/39 (EP);
B63G8/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRUKTUR FÜR EIN UNTERWASSERFAHRZEUG WIE EIN UNTERSEEBOOT | [2015/16] | English: | STRUCTURE FOR AN UNDERWATER VEHICLE SUCH AS A SUBMARINE | [2015/16] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ENGIN SOUS-MARIN TEL QU'UN SOUS-MARIN | [2015/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 23.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.05.2017
11.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Marine Systems GmbH Werftstrasse 112-114 24143 Kiel / DE Opponent's representative Schwöbel, Thilo K. Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.05.2017
11.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Marine Systems GmbH Werftstrasse 112-114 24143 Kiel / DE Opponent's representative Schwöbel, Thilo K. Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | 20.06.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.10.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.09.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/10] | 28.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.10.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.10.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2013 | AL | 10.08.2016 | AT | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | IT | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | MT | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | RS | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | SM | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | IE | 05.06.2017 | LU | 05.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 05.06.2013 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 05.06.2013 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.06.2013 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.08.2016 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4012094 (SCHOTTEL WERFT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2691596 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 7* abstract *; | [A]FR2732806 (MEDITERRANEE CONST IND [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 4 *; | [A]US5954009 (ESMIOL MATTHEW A [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | Opposition | US1500997 | US4267792 | EP0214525 | DE19623127 | DE102009018624 | - "DELFINO - sottomarino", Gruppo di Cultura Navale, (20120817), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20120817202503/http://www.culturanavale.it/documentazione.php?id=218, XP055379296 |