EP2859538 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING VALUE DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/16] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING DOCUMENTS OF VALUE | ||
[2019/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE | [2017/33] |
Former [2015/16] | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOPFER, Peter Untere Dorfstrasse 23 82269 Geltendorf / DE | 02 /
DEMMELER, Erwin Zur Rossweide 15 87700 Memmingen / DE | 03 /
DICKLBERGER, Oskar Perlacher Strasse 124b 81539 München / DE | 04 /
HILDEBRANDT, Thomas Geltinger Strasse 2d 85652 Pliening / DE | [2015/16] | Application number, filing date | 13727051.8 | 05.06.2013 | [2019/32] | WO2013EP01649 | Priority number, date | DE20121011231 | 06.06.2012 Original published format: DE102012011231 | [2015/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013182305 | Date: | 12.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2859538 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2859538 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G07D11/00 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
G07D11/165 (EP,KR,US);
B65B69/00 (KR,RU,US);
G07D11/12 (EP,KR,US);
B65H1/02 (EP,KR,US);
B65H1/28 (EP,KR,US);
B65H1/30 (EP,KR,US);
B65H31/3045 (EP,KR,US);
B65H7/02 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2301/42242 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2301/422542 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2405/3312 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2405/352 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/20, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/11 (EP,US);
B65H2511/20, B65H2220/02, B65H2220/11 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE BEARBEITUNG VON WERTDOKUMENTEN | [2015/16] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING VALUE DOCUMENTS | [2019/07] | French: | MÉTHODE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENTS DE DOCUMENTS DE VALEUR | [2019/07] |
Former [2015/16] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING DOCUMENTS OF VALUE | ||
Former [2015/16] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE DOCUMENTS DE VALEUR | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 30.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2013 | AL | 07.08.2019 | CY | 07.08.2019 | CZ | 07.08.2019 | DK | 07.08.2019 | EE | 07.08.2019 | ES | 07.08.2019 | FI | 07.08.2019 | HR | 07.08.2019 | IT | 07.08.2019 | LT | 07.08.2019 | LV | 07.08.2019 | MC | 07.08.2019 | MK | 07.08.2019 | MT | 07.08.2019 | NL | 07.08.2019 | PL | 07.08.2019 | RO | 07.08.2019 | RS | 07.08.2019 | SE | 07.08.2019 | SI | 07.08.2019 | SK | 07.08.2019 | SM | 07.08.2019 | TR | 07.08.2019 | BG | 07.11.2019 | NO | 07.11.2019 | GR | 08.11.2019 | IS | 07.12.2019 | PT | 09.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.06.2013 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
MT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NO | 07.11.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4776080 (CHRISTENSEN BLAKE [US]) [A] 1-18 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 44 *; | [A]US5186303 (SETO SHIGEO [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 2, line 22 - line 48 *; | [A]FR2698306 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 18 *; | [A]DE20216636U (KUKA SCHWEISSANLAGEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0029] ** figures 1, 2 *; | [XD]DE102009042891 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1-18 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0058] * * figures 1-3, 6c * |