EP2850415 - METHOD FOR QUANTITATIVELY DETERMINING EYELASH CLUMPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Charles, Robert Gillette Reading Plant 452 Basingstoke Road Reading RG2 0QE / GB | 02 /
HODGETTS, Jennifer, Clare 29 John Burn Mill Bourneside Road Addleston KT15 2JX / GB | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Belgium UK N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Engisch, Gautier, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 13728574.8 | 15.05.2013 | WO2013US41135 | Priority number, date | US201261646961P | 15.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261646961 P | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013173452 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2850415 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/85, A45D44/00, G01N21/84, G01N21/898, G01N33/483, G01N21/94 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
G01N33/4833 (EP,US);
A45D44/00 (EP,US);
G01N21/84 (EP,US);
G01N21/8983 (EP,US);
G01N21/94 (EP,US);
G06V40/19 (US);
A45D2044/007 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | G01N21/85 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR QUANTITATIVEN BESTIMMUNG VON AUGENWIMPERNKLUMPEN | [2015/13] | English: | METHOD FOR QUANTITATIVELY DETERMINING EYELASH CLUMPING | [2015/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION QUANTITATIVE D'UNE AGGLUTINATION DE CILS | [2015/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 17.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/16] | 04.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.08.2017 | 31.05.2019 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.2019 | 31.05.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO2012158857 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * abstract * * page 17 - page 21 *; | [A]CN102360418 (UNIV SHANDONG) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2010028285 (FRAMPTON KATIE ANN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | Examination | WO2012158857 |