EP2849613 - DRINKING DEVICE WITH A CONVEYING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mam Babyartikel Gesellschaft m.b.H. Lorenz-Mandl-Gasse 50 1160 Wien / AT | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖHRIG, Peter Himmelschlüsselweg 3a 1160 Wien / AT | [2019/17] |
Former [2015/13] | 01 /
RÖHRIG, Peter Himmelschlüsselweg 3a A-1160 Wien / AT | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 13728930.2 | 14.05.2013 | [2019/17] | WO2013AT50108 | Priority number, date | AT20120050181 | 14.05.2012 Original published format: AT 501812012 | [2015/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013170286 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2849613 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2849613 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47G19/22 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
A47G19/2272 (EP,IL,US);
A61G11/00 (IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRINKVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER FÖRDEREINRICHTUNG | [2015/13] | English: | DRINKING DEVICE WITH A CONVEYING MEANS | [2015/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR BOIRE PRÉSENTANT UN DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT | [2015/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 23.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.05.2013 | AL | 24.04.2019 | CY | 24.04.2019 | CZ | 24.04.2019 | DK | 24.04.2019 | EE | 24.04.2019 | HR | 24.04.2019 | LT | 24.04.2019 | LV | 24.04.2019 | MC | 24.04.2019 | MK | 24.04.2019 | MT | 24.04.2019 | RO | 24.04.2019 | RS | 24.04.2019 | SI | 24.04.2019 | SK | 24.04.2019 | SM | 24.04.2019 | TR | 24.04.2019 | IE | 14.05.2019 | LU | 14.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | BG | 24.07.2019 | NO | 24.07.2019 | GR | 25.07.2019 | IS | 24.08.2019 | PT | 24.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.05.2013 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
MT | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.05.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.05.2013 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.05.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.05.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.05.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.05.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | LT | 24.04.2019 | |
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 24.04.2019 | |
NO | 24.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE10016053 (KARSEBOOM & GOUVERNEUR B V [NL]) [Y] 13-16 * paragraph [0006]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XDYI]US6755318 (BURKE ANDREA [US], et al) [XD] 1-3,8,10,12,19-22,24 * column 10, line 15 - column 11, line 14; figures 5A-5b * * column 6, line 44 - column 9, line 10; figures 2, 2A * [Y] 13-16 [I] 4-7,9,11,13,14,17,18,23; | [A]WO2004065247 (BAMED AG [CH], et al) [A] 11,13-16* abstract * | by applicant | US4016998 | US4442948 | US6755318 | US2006006182 | US7210596 |