EP2890464 - TRAVELLER FOR A SAFETY SYSTEM COMPRISING A GUIDE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skylotec GmbH Im Mühlengrund 6-8 56566 Neuwied / DE | [2015/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTERBERG, Martin Im Bruch 11-15 56567 Neuwied / DE | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Werner-Eckert-Str. 4 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13729260.3 | 10.06.2013 | [2016/42] | WO2013EP01694 | Priority number, date | DE20122008378U | 31.08.2012 Original published format: DE 202012008378 U | [2015/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014032746 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2890464 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2890464 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A62B35/00, E06C7/18, E04G21/32 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
E06C7/186 (EP);
A62B35/0062 (EP);
A62B35/0081 (EP);
E04G21/3295 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÄUFER FÜR EIN SICHERUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINEM FÜHRUNGSELEMENT | [2015/28] | English: | TRAVELLER FOR A SAFETY SYSTEM COMPRISING A GUIDE ELEMENT | [2015/28] | French: | COULISSEAU POUR SYSTÈME D'ASSURAGE AVEC ÉLÉMENT DE GUIDAGE | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 03.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2013 | AL | 19.10.2016 | CY | 19.10.2016 | CZ | 19.10.2016 | EE | 19.10.2016 | ES | 19.10.2016 | FI | 19.10.2016 | HR | 19.10.2016 | IT | 19.10.2016 | LT | 19.10.2016 | LV | 19.10.2016 | MC | 19.10.2016 | MK | 19.10.2016 | MT | 19.10.2016 | NL | 19.10.2016 | PL | 19.10.2016 | RO | 19.10.2016 | RS | 19.10.2016 | SE | 19.10.2016 | SI | 19.10.2016 | SK | 19.10.2016 | SM | 19.10.2016 | TR | 19.10.2016 | BG | 19.01.2017 | NO | 19.01.2017 | GR | 20.01.2017 | IS | 19.02.2017 | PT | 20.02.2017 | IE | 10.06.2017 | LU | 10.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 10.06.2013 | |
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
TR | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 10.06.2013 | |
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 10.06.2013 | |
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | ES | 19.10.2016 | |
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 19.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2010026201 (UNILINE SAFETY SYSTEMS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0002] * * paragraphs [0005] - [0020] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0043] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0049] * * figures 1-13 * [A] 7,8 [I] 5; | [XAYI]EP0279929 (ZENHAEUSERN HEINRICH) [X] 1,4,6,9 * column 1, lines 1-24 * * column 2, lines 9-34 * * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 56 * * column 5, line 57 - column 8, line 54 * * figures 1-9 * [A] 2,3 [Y] 7,8 [I] 5; | [YA]JP2001017558 (FUJII DENKO) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0008] - [0009] * * figures 1-7 * [A] 1-6,9; | [A]JP2006255301 (SANKO IND CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0003] - [0008] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0028] * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5265696 (CASEBOLT SCOTT C [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 1, lines 5-12 * * column 4, lines 35-68 * * figures 2-9 *; | [A]DE3510602 (MITTELMANN ARMATUREN [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 12, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-4 *; | [AD]EP1488828 (ZARGES GMBH & CO KG FA [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE202009014714U | EP1488828 |