EP2865043 - BATTERY COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SEMICONDUCTOR-BASED SEPARATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 446-577 / KR | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINK, Holger Rotkaeppchenweg 31 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Bee, Joachim Robert Bosch GmbH C/IPE Wernerstrasse 51 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Bee, Joachim Robert Bosch GmbH C/IPE Wernerstrasse 1 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 13729336.1 | 17.06.2013 | [2016/16] | WO2013EP62486 | Priority number, date | DE201210210602 | 22.06.2012 Original published format: DE102012210602 | [2015/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013189875 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2865043 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2865043 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/42, H01M10/46, H01M10/48, B60L11/18, H02J7/00, H02J7/14 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
H01M10/46 (EP,CN,US);
B60L58/18 (EP,CN);
B60L50/51 (EP,CN);
B60L58/21 (EP,CN);
H01M10/4207 (EP,CN);
H01M10/482 (EP,CN,US);
H02J7/0016 (EP,CN,US);
H02J7/0029 (EP,CN,US);
H02J7/1423 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2015/18] | H01M10/42, H01M10/46, H01M10/48, B60L11/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIE MIT MINDESTENS EINER HALBLEITERBASIERTEN TRENNEINRICHTUNG | [2015/18] | English: | BATTERY COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SEMICONDUCTOR-BASED SEPARATING DEVICE | [2015/18] | French: | BATTERIE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 22.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2013 | AL | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.04.2016 | IT | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | MK | 20.04.2016 | MT | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | RS | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | SM | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | IE | 17.06.2016 | LU | 17.06.2016 | BE | 30.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 17.06.2013 | |
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
MT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 17.06.2016 | ||
LU | 17.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 17.06.2013 | |
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
MT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 17.06.2016 | ||
LU | 17.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 17.06.2013 | |
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
MT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 17.06.2016 | ||
LU | 17.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 17.06.2013 | |
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 17.06.2016 | ||
LU | 17.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 17.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
NO | 20.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2010305792 (WILK MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 7] , [0 34] , [0 39] , [0 50] - [0052] - [0 72]; figures 3-5, 7; claims 1, 2, 8 * [Y] 1-11; | [XY]US2011118916 (GULLICHSEN ERIC [NZ]) [X] 1-9,11 * paragraphs [0038] - [0040] - [0 43] - [0045] - [0 54] , [0 59] , [0 65]; figures 2a, 2b, 3; claims 2-5, 8, 11-14 * [Y] 1-11; | [XY]DE102010027861 (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [00 8] - [0010] - [0 27] , [0 31] , [0 32]; claim 4 * [Y] 1-11; | [XY]DE102010027856 (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 11] , [0 14] - [0016] - [0 22] , [0 23]; figures 3, 4; claims 1, 5-7 * [Y] 1-11; | [XY]EP2405565 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,9,11 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 21] - [0025]; figure 2 * [Y] 1-11; | [XY]EP2408053 (O2MICRO INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7,9-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 9] , [0 11] , [0 14]; figures 1A, 1B, 3A, 3B, 4A, 4B * [Y] 1-11; | [XY]DE102010041014 (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9-11 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 12] , [0 27] - [0030]; claims 1, 7, 8 *[Y] 1-11 | by applicant | DE102010027856 | DE102010041014 |