EP2826065 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TEMPORARY BONDING OF ULTRA THIN WAFERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suss MicroTec Lithography GmbH Schleißheimer Straße 90 85748 Garching / DE | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/04] | For all designated states Süss Microtec Lithography GmbH Schleißheimer Str. 90 85748 Garching / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEORGE, Gregory 156 Liberty Lane Colchester, VT 05446 / US | 02 /
LUTTER, Stefan Lutherstrasse 9 75239 Eisingen / DE | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13729416.1 | 09.03.2013 | WO2013IB00907 | Priority number, date | US201261611627P | 16.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261611627 P | US201313790684 | 08.03.2013 Original published format: US201313790684 | [2015/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013136188 | Date: | 19.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2826065 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/683, H01L21/67 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
H01L21/67092 (EP,CN,US);
B32B37/0046 (US);
B32B37/1284 (US);
B32B37/18 (US);
H01L21/0201 (US);
H01L21/2007 (US);
H01L21/6835 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/202 (US);
B32B2457/14 (US);
H01L21/6836 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2221/68318 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2221/68327 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TEMPORÄREN BONDEN VON ULTRADÜNNEN WAFERN | [2015/04] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TEMPORARY BONDING OF ULTRA THIN WAFERS | [2015/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE SOUDER PROVISOIREMENT DES TRANCHES ULTRA-MINCES | [2015/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 02.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/47] | 14.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.12.2020 | 08.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007077728 (KULKARNI SUDHAKAR N [US], et al) [Y] 22 * figure 2 ** paragraphs [0015] - [0022] *; | [Y]US7232740 (MOUNTAIN DAVID J [US]) [Y] 7 * figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 61 - column 7, line 6 *; | [IY]US2012034437 (PULIGADDA RAMA [US], et al) [I] 1-6,8-21,23-25 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0067] - [0079] * [Y] 7,22 | Examination | US2005221598 | US2011010908 | US8757603 | - Süss Microtec, "XBS300 Platform for temporary wafer bonding", (20130201), pages 1 - 2, URL: www.suss.com, (20200507), XP055692535 | by applicant | US20100761014 |