EP2847210 - V1A RECEPTOR AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MC, MK, MT | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferring BV Polaris Avenue 144 2132 JX Hoofddorp / NL | [2015/18] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Ferring BV Polaris Avenue 144 2132 JX Hoofddorp / NL | ||
For all designated states Wisniewski, Kazimierz 8274 Chandler Hill Court San Diego, California 92127 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WISNIEWSKI, Kazimierz 8274 Chandler Hill Court San Diego, California 92127 / US | 02 /
HARRIS, Geoffrey S. 231 S Nardo Ave. Solana Beach, California 92075 / US | 03 /
GALYEAN, Robert Felix 19692 Kingsley Cove Place Cottonwood, California 96022 / US | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13729826.1 | 09.05.2013 | [2016/07] | WO2013US40414 | Priority number, date | US201261645558P | 10.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261645558 P | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013170077 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2847210 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2847210 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61P1/16, A61P9/02 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
C07K7/16 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C07K7/02 (KR);
C07K7/06 (RU,US);
A61K38/095 (KR,RU);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2015/12] | C07K7/16, A61K38/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AGONISTEN DES V1A-REZEPTORS | [2015/41] | English: | V1A RECEPTOR AGONISTS | [2015/12] | French: | AGONISTES DE RÉCEPTEUR V1A | [2015/12] |
Former [2015/12] | V1A-REZEPTORAGONISTEN | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 06.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.02.2016 | MC | 17.02.2016 | MK | 17.02.2016 | SM | 17.02.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2016/50] | SM | 17.02.2016 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP1188443 (FERRING BV [NL], et al) [I] 1-93 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 8; example - *; | [A]WO2009020934 (PHARMAIN CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-93* example - * |