EP2850259 - IMPROVED-GRIP REINFORCING BAR AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/13] | IMPROVED-GRIP REINFORCING BAR AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SAME | ||
[2016/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE CIVILE DE BREVETS MATIERE 17, avenue Aristide-Briand 15000 Aurillac / FR | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATIERE, Marcel 17 avenue Aristide Briand F-15000 Aurillac / FR | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 32, rue de l'Arcade 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/34] | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 14-16 Rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2015/13] | Coralis Harle 14-16 Rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13729991.3 | 17.05.2013 | [2016/34] | WO2013FR51097 | Priority number, date | FR20120054556 | 18.05.2012 Original published format: FR 1254556 | [2015/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013171437 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2850259 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2850259 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B21B1/22, E04C5/01, E04C5/03, E04C5/06 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
E04C5/03 (EP,US);
E04C5/01 (US);
B21B1/22 (US);
E04C5/06 (US);
E04C5/064 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49632 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | E04C5/03, E04C5/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEHRUNGSSTAB MIT VERBESSERTEM GRIFF UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2015/13] | English: | IMPROVED-GRIP REINFORCING BAR AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME | [2016/16] | French: | BARRE D'ARMATURE À ADHÉRENCE AMELIORÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION | [2016/17] |
Former [2015/13] | IMPROVED-GRIP REINFORCING BAR AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SAME | ||
Former [2015/13] | BARRE D'ARMATURE A ADHERENCE AMELIOREE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 03.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2013 | AL | 24.08.2016 | CY | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | HR | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | MK | 24.08.2016 | MT | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | RS | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | SM | 24.08.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | NO | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | IS | 24.12.2016 | IE | 17.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 17.05.2013 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 17.05.2013 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.05.2013 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 24.08.2016 | |
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | EE | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | EE | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | EE | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XDI]FR765943 (SELORON) [XD] 1-3,7,16 * the whole document *[I] 13,14,17-19; | [XI]US4116010 (VIDAL HENRI) [X] 1-5,7,8 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 35; figures 1,14,18 * [I] 6,13,14; | [XI]WO9511351 (VIDAL HENRI BREVETS [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * page 11, line 12 - page 12, line 32; figures 4, 10 * [I] 13,14 | Examination | US2246578 | EP0621380 | by applicant | FR765943 | FR2814480 | WO2010067023 |