EP2858558 - SUPPORT SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING NEURODEGENERATIVE DISORDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technical University of Denmark DTU-Bygning 101A Anker Engelundsvej 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2015/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEMPFNER, Lykke Kærlundevej 49 DK-2730 Herlev / DK | 02 /
JENNUM, Poul Jørgen Skovbakken 100 DK-3520 Farum / DK | 03 /
SØRENSEN, Helge Bjarup Dissing Baunevej 2A DK-3230 Græsted / DK | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/16] | Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 13730514.0 | 12.06.2013 | WO2013EP62164 | Priority number, date | EP20120171637 | 12.06.2012 Original published format: EP 12171637 | [2015/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013186265 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2858558 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0488, A61B5/0476, A61B5/0496, A61B5/00 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
A61B5/4812 (EP,US);
A61B5/4082 (US);
A61B5/4088 (US);
A61B5/4809 (EP,US);
A61B5/7264 (EP,US);
A61B5/7275 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/369 (EP,US);
A61B5/389 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Title | German: | HILFSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS NEURODEGENERATIVER ERKRANKUNGEN | [2015/16] | English: | SUPPORT SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING NEURODEGENERATIVE DISORDER | [2015/16] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AIDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UN TROUBLE NEURODÉGÉNÉRATIF | [2015/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 07.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008262373 (BURNS JOSEPH W [US], et al) [X] 31-37,39-53 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0021] , [0024] , [0027] , [0028] , [0039] * * claim 14 * [I] 38 | [X] - KEMPFNER J ET AL, "Automatic REM sleep detection associated with idiopathic rem sleep Behavior Disorder", ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY,EMBC, 2011 ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE, IEEE, (20110830), doi:10.1109/IEMBS.2011.6091498, ISBN 978-1-4244-4121-1, pages 6063 - 6066, XP032026500 [X] 31-53 * figure 1 * * abstract * * page 6064 - page 6065 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.2011.6091498 | by applicant | - BOEVE B; SILBER M; FERMAN T; LUCAS J; PARISI J, "Association of REM sleep behavior disorder and neurodegenerative disease may reflect an underlying synucleinopathy", MOV DISORD, (2001), vol. 16, pages 622 - 630 | - BOSER B; GUYON M; VAPNIK V, "A training algorithm for optimal margin classifiers", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 5TH ANNUAL A CM WORKSHOP ON COMPUTATIONAL LEARNING THEORY, (1992), pages 144 - 152 | - BURNS J; CONSENS F; LITTLE R; ANGELL K; GILMAN S; CHERVIN R, "EMG variance during polysomnography as an assessment for REM sleep behavior disorder", SLEEP, (2007), vol. 30, pages 265 - 271 | - CORTES C; VAPNIK V, "Support-vector network", MACHINE LEARNING, (1995), vol. 20, pages 273 - 297 | - DRAKE J; CHALLAGHAN J, "Elimination of electrocardiogram contamination from electromyogram signals: An evaluation of currently used removal techniques", J ELECTROMYOGR KINESIOL., (2006), vol. 16, pages 175 - 187 | - FERRI R; FULDA S; COSENTINO F; PIZZA F; PLAZZI G, "A preliminary quantitative analysis of REM sleep chin EMG in Parkinson's disease with or without REM sleep behavior disorder", SLEEP MED, (2012), vol. 13, pages 707 - 713 | - FORMAN G; SCHOLZ M, "Apples-to-apples in cross-validation studies: pitfalls in classifier performance measurement", ACM SIGKDD EXPLORATIONS NEWSLETTER, (2010), vol. 12, pages 49 - 57 | - FRAUSCHER B; IRANZO A; GAIG C; GSCHLIESSER V; GUAITA M; RAFFELSEDER V; EHRMANN L; SOLA N; SALAMERO M; TOLOSA E, "Normative EMG values during REM sleep for the diagnosis of REM sleep behavior disorder", SLEEP, (2012), vol. 35, pages 835 - 847 | - GUSTAFSSON F, "Determining the initial states in forward-backward filtering", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (1996), vol. 44, pages 988 - 992 | - IRANZO A; MOLINUEVO J; SANTAMARIA J; SERRADELL M; MARTI J; VALLDEORIOLA F; TOLOSA E, "Rapid-eye-movement sleep behaviour disorder as an early marker for a neurodegenerative disorder: a descriptive study", LANCET NEUROL, (2006), vol. 5, pages 572 - 577 | - KEMP B; VARRIB A; ROSAC A; NIELSEND K; GADED J, "A simple format for exchange of digitized polygraphic recordings", ELECTROENCEPHALOGR CLIN NEUROPHYSIOL, (1992), vol. 82, pages 391 - 393 | - KEMPFNER J; JENNUM P; NIKOLIC M; CHRISTENSEN J; SORENSEN H, "Automatic detection of REM sleep in subjects without atonia", CONF PROC IEEE ENG MED BIOL SOC., (2012), pages 4242 - 4245 | - KEMPFNER J; SORENSEN G; SORENSEN H; JENNUM P, "Automatic REM sleep detection associated with idiopathic REM sleep behavior disorder", CONF PROC IEEE ENG MED BIOL SOC, (2011), pages 6063 - 6066 | - KEMPFNER J; SORENSEN G; ZOETMULDER M; JENNUM P; SORENSEN H, "REM Behaviour disorder detection associated with neurodegenerative diseases", CONF PROC IEEE ENG MED BIOL SOC, (2010), pages 5093 - 5096 | - MAYER G; KESPER K; PLOCH T; CANISIUS S; PENZEL T; OERTEL W; STIASNY-KOLSTER K, "Quantification of tonic and phasic muscle activity in REM sleep behavior disorder", J CLIN NEUROPHYSIOL, (2008), vol. 25, pages 48 - 55 | - MCCARTER S; ST LOUIS E; BOEVE B, "REM sleep behavior disorder and REM sleep without atonia as an early manifestation of degenerative neurological disease", CURRNEUROL NEUROSCI REP, (2012), vol. 12, pages 182 - 192 | - MOURÃO-MIRANDA J; HARDOON D; HAHN T; MARQUAND A; WILLIAMS S; SHAWE-TAYLOR J; BRAMMER M, "Patient classification as an outlier detection problem: an application of the one-class support vector machine", NEUROIMAGE, (2011), vol. 58, pages 793 - 804 | - POSTUMA R; GAGNON J; ROMPRE S; MONTPLAISIR J, "Severity of REM atonia loss in idiopathic REM sleep behavior disorder predicts Parkinson disease", NEUROLOGY, (2010), vol. 74, pages 239 - 244 | - POSTUMA R; GAGNON J; VENDETTE M; FANTINI M; MASSICOTTE-MARQUEZ, J.; MONTPLAISIR J., "Quantifying the risk of neurodegenerative disease in idiopathic REM sleep behavior disorder", NEUROLOGY, (2009), vol. 72, pages 1296 - 1300 | - SCHENCK C; BUNDLIE S; MAHOWALD M, "Delayed emergence of a parkinsonian disorder in 38% of 29 older men initially diagnosed with idiopathic rapid eye movement sleep behaviour disorder", NEUROLOGY, (1996), vol. 46, pages 388 - 393 | - SCHÖLKOPF B; PLATT J; SHAWE-TAYLOR J; SMOLA A; WILLIAMSON R, "Estimating the support of a high-dimensional distribution", JOURNAL NEURAL COMPUTATION, (2001), vol. 13, pages 1443 - 1471 | - SHOKROLLAHI M; KRISHNAN S; JEWELL D; MURRAY B, "Analysis of the electromyogram of rapid eye movement sleep using wavelet techniques", CONF PROC IEEE ENG MED BIOL SOC, (2009), pages 2659 - 2662 | - SHOKROLLAHI M; KRISHNAN S; JEWELL D; MURRAY B, "Autoregressive and cepstral analysis of electromyogram in rapid movement sleep", WC IFMBE PROCEEDINGS, (2009), pages 1590 - 1583 |