EP2842466 - BEVERAGE PREPARATION MACHINE WITH DIFFERENT WATER SUPPLY MEANS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAID MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novadelta-Comércio e Industria de Cafés, S.A. Avenida Infante D. Henrique, 151 A 1950-406 Lisboa / PT | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NABEIRO, Rui Miguel Rua Dr. Tello da Gama N.º 89 P-7370-112 Campo Maior / PT | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Miranda de Sousa, João Paulo Vaz Garrigues IP, Unipessoal Lda. Av. da República, 25-1° 1050-186 Lisboa / PT | [2015/10] | Application number, filing date | 13730954.8 | 24.04.2013 | WO2013PT00023 | Priority number, date | PT20120106269 | 26.04.2012 Original published format: PT 2012106269 | [2015/10] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013162393 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | PT | [2013/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2842466 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44, A47J31/46 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
A47J31/4403 (EP,US);
A47J31/461 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | GETRÄNKEHERSTELLUNGSMASCHINE MIT VERSCHIEDENEN WASSERVERSORGUNGSMITTELN UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DER BESAGTEN MASCHINE | [2015/10] | English: | BEVERAGE PREPARATION MACHINE WITH DIFFERENT WATER SUPPLY MEANS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAID MACHINE | [2015/10] | French: | MACHINE DE PRÉPARATION DE BOISSONS AVEC DIFFÉRENTS MOYENS DE REMPLISSAGE EN EAU, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE LADITE MACHINE | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2014 | Translation filed | 16.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 06.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2004033335 (PI DESIGN AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0045]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2,3,8; | [XI]US5431205 (GEBHARD ALBERT W [US]) [X] 1-7,9,11 * column 4, line 22 - column 6, line 65; figures 1-4 * [I] 8,12-15; | [E]WO2013110203 (SPEICH FRANCISCO [CH]) [E] 1,2,4-8,10-15 * page 11 - page 12; figures 8-10c * * page 14, line 4 - page 19, line 12 *; | [A]US4640426 (WASLEY BERNARD [US]) [A] 2-9 * figure 1 * | by applicant | CH700109 | CH700108 | EP1369070 | EP1055386 |