EP2864342 - 1,1'-[[(SUBSTITUTED ALKYL)IMINO]BIS(ALKYLENE)]BIS-FERROCENES AND THEIR USE IN ELECTROCHEMICAL ASSAYS BY LABELLING SUBSTRATES OF INTEREST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/18] | 1,1 '-[[(SUBSTITUTED ALKYL)IMINO]BIS(ALKYLENE)]BIS-FERROCENES AND THEIR USE IN I ELECTROCHEMICAL ASSAYS BY LABELLING SUBSTRATES OF INTEREST | ||
[2020/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Binx Health Limited Derby Court Epsom Square White Horse Business Park Trowbridge BA14 0XG / GB | [2021/26] |
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states Atlas Genetics Limited Derby Court Epsom Square White Horse Business Park Trowbridge, Wiltshire BA14 0XG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARSH, Barrie c/o Atlas Genetics Limited Derby Court Epsom Square White Horse Business Park Trowbridge Wiltshire BA14 0XG / GB | 02 /
FROST, Christopher c/o University of Bath Claverton Down Bath Bath and North East Somerset BA14 7AY / GB | 03 /
PEARCE, David c/o Altas Genetics Limited Derby Court Epsom Square White Horse Business Park Trowbridge Wiltshire BA14 0XG / GB | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/18] | Application number, filing date | 13731474.6 | 21.06.2013 | [2021/31] | WO2013GB51643 | Priority number, date | GB20120011157 | 22.06.2012 Original published format: GB 201211157 | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013190328 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2864342 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2864342 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07F17/02, C12Q1/68, G01N27/00, C12Q1/6816 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
C07F17/02 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/58 (US);
C12Q1/6816 (EP,CN,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2563/113 (CN,EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/18] | C07F17/02, C12Q1/68, G01N27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 1,1'-[[(SUBSTITUIERTE ALKYL)IMINO](BIS)(ALKYLEN)]BIS-FERROCENE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG BEI ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN TESTVERFAHREN DURCH MARKIERUNG VON BESTIMMTEN SUBSTRATEN | [2015/18] | English: | 1,1'-[[(SUBSTITUTED ALKYL)IMINO]BIS(ALKYLENE)]BIS-FERROCENES AND THEIR USE IN ELECTROCHEMICAL ASSAYS BY LABELLING SUBSTRATES OF INTEREST | [2020/43] | French: | 1,1'-[[(ALKYLE SUBSTITUÉ)IMINO]BIS(ALKYLÈNE)]BIS-FERROCÈNES ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES DOSAGES ÉLECTROCHIMIQUES PAR MARQUAGE DE SUBSTRATS D'INTÉRÊT | [2015/18] |
Former [2015/18] | 1,1 '-[[(SUBSTITUTED ALKYL)IMINO]BIS(ALKYLENE)]BIS-FERROCENES AND THEIR USE IN I ELECTROCHEMICAL ASSAYS BY LABELLING SUBSTRATES OF INTEREST | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21188839.1 / EP3974435 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2013 | AL | 04.08.2021 | AT | 04.08.2021 | CY | 04.08.2021 | CZ | 04.08.2021 | DK | 04.08.2021 | EE | 04.08.2021 | FI | 04.08.2021 | HR | 04.08.2021 | LT | 04.08.2021 | LV | 04.08.2021 | MC | 04.08.2021 | MK | 04.08.2021 | MT | 04.08.2021 | NL | 04.08.2021 | PL | 04.08.2021 | RO | 04.08.2021 | RS | 04.08.2021 | SE | 04.08.2021 | SI | 04.08.2021 | SK | 04.08.2021 | SM | 04.08.2021 | TR | 04.08.2021 | BG | 04.11.2021 | NO | 04.11.2021 | GR | 05.11.2021 | IS | 04.12.2021 | PT | 06.12.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
MK | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
TR | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
MK | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005005657 (MOLECULAR SENSING PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-54 * page 8; compounds formula I, IIa * * page 23; example 3b * * Method of detection,using eletrochemically active marker:;; claims 1-9 *; | [A]WO2011073675 (ATLAS GENETICS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-54 * page 34; compounds Formula VII, VIII * * Method of detecting genetic material using electrochemically active marker:;; claims 1-5 *; | [IP]WO2012085591 (ATLAS GENETICS LTD [GB], et al) [IP] 1-54* page 46, column left, line 1; claim 30; compounds Bromo-compound *; | [X] - HU, XIANG PING ET AL, "Synthesis and potential application of novel C2-symmetrical bis(ferrocenyl) P2N ligand", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2004:39098, URL: STN, XP002713991 [X] 13-17,24-29,31,35,37,38 * abstract * * (2R,2''R)-1,1''-[(methylimino)di-(1R)-ethylidiene]bis[2-(diphenylphosphino)-ferrocene * | [X] - DONG-JEI CHO ET AL, "Chiral C2-symmetric bisferrocenyldiamines as ligands for transition metal catalyzed asymmetric cyclopropanation and aziridination", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (1999), vol. 10, no. 19, doi:10.1016/S0957-4166(99)00423-1, ISSN 0957-4166, pages 3833 - 3848, XP055081769 [X] 13-17,24-29,31,35,37,38 * compounds 3a, 3c * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(99)00423-1 | [X] - MARTIN LAMAČ ET AL, "Preparation of planar-chiral multidonor phosphanylferrocene carboxamides and their application as ligands for palladium-catalysed asymmetric allylic alkylation", APPLIED ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (20100122), doi:10.1002/aoc.1616, ISSN 0268-2605, pages n/a - n/a, XP055081777 [X] 13-17,24-29,31,35,37,38 * Scheme 1:;; compound 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/aoc.1616 | [X] - KUHNERT J ET AL, "Phosphinoferrocenyl-terminated amidoamines: Synthesis and catalytic utilization in palladium-mediated C-C bond forming reactions", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 285, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.MOLCATA.2008.01.026, ISSN 1381-1169, (20080418), pages 41 - 47, (20080120), XP022656042 [X] 13-17,24-29,31,35,37,38 * compound P3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcata.2008.01.026 |