EP2837892 - KITCHEN OVEN AND COOKING RANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Do Brasil S.A. Ministro Gabriel Passos N.360 Guabirotuba 81520-900 Curitiba - PR / BR | [2015/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCOVICZ, Elder Carlos Rua Itajubá 643 - Apt 401 Bl 1 Bairro Portão 81070-190 Curitiba - PR / BR | 02 /
LOBO, Orlando H. T. Sprenger Rua Montesquieu 46 82700-150 Curitiba - PR / BR | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Samzelius, Roger Mikael AB Electrolux Group Intellectual Property S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13731656.8 | 12.04.2013 | WO2013BR00120 | Priority number, date | BR2012PI08747 | 13.04.2012 Original published format: BR PI1208747 | [2015/08] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013152411 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | PT | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2837892 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/00 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
F24C15/005 (EP);
F24C15/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Title | German: | KÜCHENHERD UND KOCHFELD | [2015/08] | English: | KITCHEN OVEN AND COOKING RANGE | [2015/08] | French: | FOUR ET CUISINIÈRE | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2014 | Translation filed | 13.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 06.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 14.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPH078387 (SHARP KK, et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0040]; figure 4 *[I] 9; | [X]JPH1183027 (SHARP KK, et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0033]; figure 1 *; | [A] - Galvinfocenter, "galvalume coated steel sheet", online, (20030831), URL: http://www.steelmillsoftheworld.com/activities/datacenter/G_Note12.pdf, (20130805), XP055074101 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - Unknown, "coated sheet", online, (20120202), URL: www.ussteel.com, (20130805), XP055074105 [A] 1 * the whole document * |